This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2020 at 06:02:59 (UTC).

Ricardo Ruiz v. Field Office Director United S, et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Ricardo Ruiz filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Field Office Director United S. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2779

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

RICARDO HERNANDEZ RUIZ

Defendant / Appellants

FIELD OFFICE DIRECTOR UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

DIRECTOR HUDSON COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY

SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Farrin R. Anello Esq.

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of New Jersey

P.O. Box 32159

Newark, NJ 07102

Emily B. Goldberg Esq.

Attorney at Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Katherine E. Haas Esq.

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of New Jersey

P.O. Box 32159

Newark, NJ 07102

Jeanne LoCicero Esq.

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of New Jersey

P.O. Box 32159

Newark, NJ 07102

Sharone S. Kaufman Esq.

Attorney at Legal Aid Society

199 Water Street, 3Rd Floor

New York, NY 10038

Julie A. Dona Esq.

Attorney at Legal Aid Society

199 Water Street, 3Rd Floor

New York, NY 10038

Molly K.C. Linhorst Esq.

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of New Jersey

P.O. Box 32159

Newark, NJ 07102

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Benjamin Kuruvilla Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

Thandiwe Boylan Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

Julian Kurz Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellants Field Office Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security and Director Hudson County Correctional Facility for Extension of Time to file Opening Brief and Joint Appendix until/for 1/4/2021. Certificate of Service dated 10/21/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-2779] (JK) [Entered: 10/21/2020 05:46 PM]

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Julie Dona on behalf of Appellee(s) Ricardo Hernandez Ruiz. [20-2779] (JAD) [Entered: 09/24/2020 03:23 PM]

9 #2

Standing Order Excess Pagination

9 #1

Briefing and Scheduling Order

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Field Office Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security and Director Hudson County Correctional Facility advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-2779] (JK) [Entered: 09/23/2020 09:41 AM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Field Office Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security and Director Hudson County Correctional Facility. [20-2779] (JK) [Entered: 09/23/2020 09:40 AM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeanne LoCicero on behalf of Appellee(s) Ricardo Hernandez Ruiz. [20-2779] (JL) [Entered: 09/21/2020 06:12 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Molly K. C. Linhorst on behalf of Appellee(s) Ricardo Hernandez Ruiz. [20-2779] (MKL) [Entered: 09/21/2020 06:06 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Farrin R. Anello on behalf of Appellee(s) Ricardo Hernandez Ruiz. [20-2779] (FRA) [Entered: 09/21/2020 05:58 PM]

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Julian Kurz on behalf of Appellant(s) Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement; Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security; Director, Hudson County Correctional Facility. [20-2779] (JK) [Entered: 09/10/2020 10:47 AM]

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

1 #5

Standing Order Excess Pagination

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Order

1 #2

District Court Opinion

#1

Civil Case Docketed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) granting unopposed motion filed by Appellants Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security, Director Hudson County Correctional Facility and Field Office Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement for extension of time to file brief and appendix until January 4, 2021. (ARR) [Entered: 10/26/2020 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellants Field Office Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security and Director Hudson County Correctional Facility for Extension of Time to file Opening Brief and Joint Appendix until/for 1/4/2021. Certificate of Service dated 10/21/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-2779] (JK) [Entered: 10/21/2020 05:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Julie Dona on behalf of Appellee(s) Ricardo Hernandez Ruiz. [20-2779] (JAD) [Entered: 09/24/2020 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Director Hudson County Correctional Facility, Field Office Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security due on or before 11/02/2020. Appendix due on or before 11/02/2020. (JK) [Entered: 09/23/2020 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Field Office Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security and Director Hudson County Correctional Facility advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-2779] (JK) [Entered: 09/23/2020 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Field Office Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security and Director Hudson County Correctional Facility. [20-2779] (JK) [Entered: 09/23/2020 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeanne LoCicero on behalf of Appellee(s) Ricardo Hernandez Ruiz. [20-2779] (JL) [Entered: 09/21/2020 06:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Molly K. C. Linhorst on behalf of Appellee(s) Ricardo Hernandez Ruiz. [20-2779] (MKL) [Entered: 09/21/2020 06:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Farrin R. Anello on behalf of Appellee(s) Ricardo Hernandez Ruiz. [20-2779] (FRA) [Entered: 09/21/2020 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Julian Kurz on behalf of Appellant(s) Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement; Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security; Director, Hudson County Correctional Facility. [20-2779] (JK) [Entered: 09/10/2020 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 09/09/2020 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Director Hudson County Correctional Facility, Field Office Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security in District Court No. 2-20-cv-05134. (JK) [Entered: 09/09/2020 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Field Office Directo Kimberly D Dean is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Kuruvilla Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THANDIWE BOYLAN