This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 06:11:57 (UTC).

Ricardo Guerrero v. Warden Allenwood USP

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Ricardo Guerrero filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden Allenwood USP. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3097

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

RICARDO GUERRERO

White Deer, PA 17887

Defendant / Appellee

WARDEN ALLENWOOD USP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Ricardo Guerrero

Attorney at Allenwood USP

P.O. Box 3000

White Deer, PA 17887

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Navin Jani Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

228 Walnut Street, P.O. Box 11754, 220 Federal Building And Courthouse

Harrisburg, PA 17108

Joseph J. Terz Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

228 Walnut Street, P.O. Box 11754, 220 Federal Building And Courthouse

Harrisburg, PA 17108

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER (Clerk) The motion is granted. Appellants brief and appendix must be filed and served on or before February 1, 2021, filed. (PDB) [Entered: 12/02/2020 02:55 PM]

#5

(#5) MOTION filed by Appellant Ricardo Guerrero for Extension of Time to File Brief and Appendix for 60 Days. Certificate of Service dated 11/25/2020. Service made by ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 11/25/2020 04:24 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from AUSA Navin Jani on behalf of Appellee(s) Warden Allenwood USP. [20-3097] (NJ) [Entered: 10/23/2020 04:27 PM]

#3

Briefing Info for Pro Se Litigants

3 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

3 #1

Standing Order

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Order dated 072320

1 #2

District Court order dated 082820

#1

Civil Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER (Clerk) The motion is granted. Appellants brief and appendix must be filed and served on or before February 1, 2021, filed. (PDB) [Entered: 12/02/2020 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION filed by Appellant Ricardo Guerrero for Extension of Time to File Brief and Appendix for 60 Days. Certificate of Service dated 11/25/2020. Service made by ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 11/25/2020 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from AUSA Navin Jani on behalf of Appellee(s) Warden Allenwood USP. [20-3097] (NJ) [Entered: 10/23/2020 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Ricardo Guerrero due on or before 12/02/2020. Appendix due on or before 12/02/2020. (PDB) [Entered: 10/23/2020 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 10/20/2020 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ricardo Guerrero in District Court No. 1-20-cv-00039. (PDB) [Entered: 10/20/2020 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less