This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/01/2021 at 06:53:52 (UTC).

Reynolds v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Reynolds filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-496

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Michael Curtis Reynolds

Greenville, IL 62246

Defendant / Appellees

Joseph Noone

Larry Whitehead

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael Curtis Reynolds

Attorney at Federal Correctional Institution

P.O. Box 5000

Greenville, IL 62246

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Steven David Clymer

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Northern District of New York

P.O. Box 7198, 100 South Clinton Street

Syracuse, NY 13261

Karen Folster Lesperance Esq.

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Northern District of New York

445 Broadway

Albany, NY 12207

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Michael Curtis Reynolds, FILED. Service date 04/15/2021 by US mail.[3085458] [21-496] [Entered: 04/23/2021 03:36 PM]

#22

(#22) ORDER, dated 04/19/2021, dismissing appeal by 05/10/2021 unless Appellant Michael Curtis, submits a signed Prisoner Authorization Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3080292] [21-496] [Entered: 04/19/2021 10:49 AM]

#21

(#21) PAPERS, copy of financial affidavit and trust account form from appellant, RECEIVED.[3077320] [21-496] [Entered: 04/14/2021 12:58 PM]

#15

(#15) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Michael Curtis Reynolds, FILED. Service date 03/31/2021 by US mail.[3074351] [21-496] [Entered: 04/09/2021 01:15 PM]

#14

(#14) BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Michael Curtis Reynolds, FILED. Service date 03/23/2021 by US mail. [3067141] [21-496] [Entered: 03/31/2021 07:31 AM]

#13

(#13) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, please be advised that we will not be participating in the captioned civil appeal, absent some further direction from the Court. RECEIVED. Service date 03/17/2021 by US mail.[3058408] [21-496] [Entered: 03/17/2021 02:20 PM]

#11

(#11) ORDER, dated 03/17/2021, dismissing appeal by 04/07/2021 unless Appellant Michael Curtis Reynolds, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3058270] [21-496] [Entered: 03/17/2021 12:34 PM]

#10

(#10) ORDER, dated 03/16/2021, dismissing appeal by 04/06/2021 unless Appellant Michael Curtis Reynolds, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3056609] [21-496] [Entered: 03/16/2021 07:41 AM]

#9

(#9) ORDER, dated 03/16/2021, dismissing appeal by 04/06/2021 unless Appellant Michael Curtis Reynolds, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3056608] [21-496] [Entered: 03/16/2021 07:36 AM]

8 #2

Supporting Document

8 #1

Notice of Appearance for Additional or Substitute Counsel FILED

#7

(#7) AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[3047565] [21-496] [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:41 PM]

#6

(#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3047558] [21-496] [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:39 PM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT TEXT ORDER, dated 02/11/2021, entered as district court docket entry 16, RECEIVED.[3047546] [21-496] [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:32 PM]

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Michael Curtis Reynolds, FILED. Service date 04/15/2021 by US mail.[3085458] [21-496] [Entered: 04/23/2021 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER, dated 04/19/2021, dismissing appeal by 05/10/2021 unless Appellant Michael Curtis, submits a signed Prisoner Authorization Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3080292] [21-496] [Entered: 04/19/2021 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PAPERS, copy of financial affidavit and trust account form from appellant, RECEIVED.[3077320] [21-496] [Entered: 04/14/2021 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Michael Curtis Reynolds, FILED. Service date 03/31/2021 by US mail.[3074351] [21-496] [Entered: 04/09/2021 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Michael Curtis Reynolds, FILED. Service date 03/23/2021 by US mail. [3067141] [21-496] [Entered: 03/31/2021 07:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, please be advised that we will not be participating in the captioned civil appeal, absent some further direction from the Court. RECEIVED. Service date 03/17/2021 by US mail.[3058408] [21-496] [Entered: 03/17/2021 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY, Karen Folster Lesperance for United States of America, Joseph Noone, Larry Whitehead in case 21-496, [ # 8 ], ADDED.[3058315] [21-496] [Entered: 03/17/2021 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER, dated 03/17/2021, dismissing appeal by 04/07/2021 unless Appellant Michael Curtis Reynolds, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3058270] [21-496] [Entered: 03/17/2021 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER, dated 03/16/2021, dismissing appeal by 04/06/2021 unless Appellant Michael Curtis Reynolds, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3056609] [21-496] [Entered: 03/16/2021 07:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER, dated 03/16/2021, dismissing appeal by 04/06/2021 unless Appellant Michael Curtis Reynolds, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3056608] [21-496] [Entered: 03/16/2021 07:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Joseph Noone, United States of America and Larry Whitehead, FILED. Service date 03/10/2021 by US mail. [3052952] [21-496] [Entered: 03/10/2021 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[3047565] [21-496] [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3047558] [21-496] [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3047552] [21-496] [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3047548] [21-496] [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT TEXT ORDER, dated 02/11/2021, entered as district court docket entry 16, RECEIVED.[3047546] [21-496] [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Michael Curtis Reynolds, FILED. [3047542] [21-496] [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen Folster Lesperance Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven David Clymer