This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/03/2022 at 06:09:57 (UTC).

Reynolds Hartwich v. Kroger Co., et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 Reynolds Hartwich filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Kroger Co . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-56218

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

REYNOLDS HARTWICH, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellees

KROGER CO.

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, a division of the Kroger Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew A. Pearson

Attorney at Pearson Simon & Warshaw, LLP

15165 Ventura Boulevard

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Benjamin Ernest Shiftan

Attorney at Pearson, Simon & Warshaw, LLP

350 Sansome Streetsuite 680

San Francisco, CA 94104

Daniel Leon Warshaw Esquire

Attorney at Pearson Simon & Warshaw, LLP

15165 Ventura Boulevard

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Melissa S. Weiner

Attorney at Pearson Simon & Warshaw, LLP

800 Lasalle Avenuesuite 2150

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jacob Harper

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP

865 S Figueroa Streetsuite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

James H. Moon Esquire

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP

865 S Figueroa Streetsuite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

Andrew Row

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP

865 S Figueroa Streetsuite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Reynolds Hartwich Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/10/2021. [12284002] [21-56218] (Weiner, Melissa) [Entered: 11/10/2021 11:07 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 12/13/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12299559] (CL) [Entered: 11/29/2021 11:39 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 12/13/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12299559] (CL) [Entered: 11/29/2021 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/10/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12284254]. [21-56218] (AD) [Entered: 11/10/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Reynolds Hartwich Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/10/2021. [12284002] [21-56218] (Weiner, Melissa) [Entered: 11/10/2021 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Reynolds Hartwich Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/12/2021. Transcript ordered by 12/03/2021. Transcript due 01/03/2022. Appellant Reynolds Hartwich opening brief due 02/08/2022. Appellees Kroger Co. and Ralphs Grocery Company answering brief due 03/11/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12278089] (RT) [Entered: 11/04/2021 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James H. Moon