This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 06:06:57 (UTC).

Reyes v. Bellamy

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Reyes filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Bellamy. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-454

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

Central Office Review Committee

Karen R. Bellamy

John Doe

Plaintiff / Appellant

Earl Reyes

Auburn, NY 13024

Defendant / Appellees

Macynus, S.P. #443

S. Michalek

Sallah Abassey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Earl Reyes

Attorney at Auburn Correctional Facility

P.O. Box 618

Auburn, NY 13024

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Barbara D. Underwood

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Robert Mark Goldfarb

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

The Capitol

Albany, NY 12224

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 01/16/2019, RECEIVED.[2503618] [19-454] [Entered: 02/22/2019 04:14 PM]

#4

(#4) AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2503648] [19-454] [Entered: 02/22/2019 04:23 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#8

(#8) NOTICE, to Appellee Sallah Abassey, Macynus and S. Michalek, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2517077] [19-454] [Entered: 03/13/2019 12:58 PM]

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#5

(#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2503657] [19-454] [Entered: 02/22/2019 04:28 PM]

#12

(#12) ORDER, dated 04/11/2019, dismissing appeal by 05/02/2019, unless Appellant Earl Reyes, submits a signed Prisoner Authorization form, copy to pro se, FILED.[2537717] [19-454] [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:18 AM]

#11

(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Sallah Abassey, Macynus and S. Michalek, FILED. Service date 03/22/2019 by US mail.[2523744] [19-454] [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:28 AM]

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Sallah Abassey, Macynus and S. Michalek, FILED. Service date 03/19/2019 by US mail. [2520863] [19-454] [Entered: 03/19/2019 11:27 AM]

#13

(#13) ORDER, dated 04/11/2019, dismissing appeal by 05/02/2019, unless Appellant Earl Reyes, submits the fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se, FILED.[2537736] [19-454] [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:27 AM]

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Sallah Abassey, Macynus and S. Michalek in 18-3020, FILED. Service date 02/26/2019 by US mail.[2505203] [19-454, 18-3020] [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:00 AM]

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER, dated 04/11/2019, dismissing appeal by 05/02/2019, unless Appellant Earl Reyes, submits the fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se, FILED.[2537736] [19-454] [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER, dated 04/11/2019, dismissing appeal by 05/02/2019, unless Appellant Earl Reyes, submits a signed Prisoner Authorization form, copy to pro se, FILED.[2537717] [19-454] [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Sallah Abassey, Macynus and S. Michalek, FILED. Service date 03/22/2019 by US mail.[2523744] [19-454] [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY, Robert M. Goldfarb, [ # 9 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2521305] [19-454] [Entered: 03/19/2019 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Sallah Abassey, Macynus and S. Michalek, FILED. Service date 03/19/2019 by US mail. [2520863] [19-454] [Entered: 03/19/2019 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE, to Appellee Sallah Abassey, Macynus and S. Michalek, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2517077] [19-454] [Entered: 03/13/2019 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Sallah Abassey, Macynus and S. Michalek in 18-3020, FILED. Service date 02/26/2019 by US mail.[2505203] [19-454, 18-3020] [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • (#6) NOTE: See lead case, 18-3020, containing complete set of docket entries.[2503686] [19-454] [Entered: 02/22/2019 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2503657] [19-454] [Entered: 02/22/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2503648] [19-454] [Entered: 02/22/2019 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2503629] [19-454] [Entered: 02/22/2019 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 01/16/2019, RECEIVED.[2503618] [19-454] [Entered: 02/22/2019 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Earl Reyes, FILED. [2503018] [19-454] [Entered: 02/22/2019 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.