Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/08/2020 at 06:04:21 (UTC).

Reyes-Caparros v. Barr

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 Reyes-Caparros filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1932

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

FRANCISCO J. REYES-CAPARROS

Defendant / Appellee

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General of the United States

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Bamily Lopez-Ortiz

Attorney at Lopez Toro, Estudio de Derecho

Po Box 635

Rio Grande, PR 00745

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Susan M. Poswistilo

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

1 Courthouse Way, Ste 9200

Boston, MA 02210

Jason C. Weida

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

1 Courthouse Way, Ste 9200

Boston, MA 02210

Donald Campbell Lockhart

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

1 Courthouse Way, Ste 9200

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Francisco J. Reyes-Caparros in 20-1792, 20-1932. Certificate of service dated 12/04/2020. [20-1792, 20-1932] (BL) [Entered: 12/04/2020 10:51 AM]

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

CROSS-APPEAL briefing schedule set pursuant to F.R.A.P. 28.1. Brief due 12/07/2020 for appellant Francisco J. Reyes-Caparros. Appendix due 12/07/2020 for appellant Francisco J. Reyes-Caparros. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1792, 20-1932] (CMP) [Entered: 10/27/2020 09:53 AM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant William P. Barr. Certificate of service dated 10/23/2020. [20-1932] (JCW) [Entered: 10/26/2020 01:12 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant William P. Barr in 20-1932 indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 10/26/2020. [20-1932] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case 20-1792. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (JCW) [Entered: 10/26/2020 01:10 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The Appellee/Cross-Appellant William P. Barr is directed to file a docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Docketing Statement and Transcript report/order form due 11/09/2020 . [20-1932] (GB) [Entered: 10/26/2020 06:43 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee/Cross-Appellant William P. Barr filed by Attorney Jason C. Weida. Certificate of service dated 10/23/2020. [20-1932] (JCW) [Entered: 10/23/2020 07:06 PM]

Open Document

ORDER directing the parties to proceed under F.R.A.P 28.1; vacating briefing schedule. [20-1792, 20-1932] (CMP) [Entered: 10/14/2020 03:31 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Francisco J. Reyes-Caparros in 20-1792, 20-1932. Certificate of service dated 12/04/2020. [20-1792, 20-1932] (BL) [Entered: 12/04/2020 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-APPEAL briefing schedule set pursuant to F.R.A.P. 28.1. Brief due 12/07/2020 for appellant Francisco J. Reyes-Caparros. Appendix due 12/07/2020 for appellant Francisco J. Reyes-Caparros. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1792, 20-1932] (CMP) [Entered: 10/27/2020 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant William P. Barr. Certificate of service dated 10/23/2020. [20-1932] (JCW) [Entered: 10/26/2020 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant William P. Barr in 20-1932 indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 10/26/2020. [20-1932] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case 20-1792. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (JCW) [Entered: 10/26/2020 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The Appellee/Cross-Appellant William P. Barr is directed to file a docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Docketing Statement and Transcript report/order form due 11/09/2020 . [20-1932] (GB) [Entered: 10/26/2020 06:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee/Cross-Appellant William P. Barr filed by Attorney Jason C. Weida. Certificate of service dated 10/23/2020. [20-1932] (JCW) [Entered: 10/23/2020 07:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER directing the parties to proceed under F.R.A.P 28.1; vacating briefing schedule. [20-1792, 20-1932] (CMP) [Entered: 10/14/2020 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #291) filed by Appellant William P. Barr. Docketing Statement due 10/23/2020. Transcript Report/Order form due 10/23/2020. Appearance form due 10/23/2020. [20-1932] (DPO) [Entered: 10/09/2020 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Susan M. Poswistilo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason C. Weida

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald Campbell Lockhart