This case was last updated from PACER on 09/09/2020 at 19:06:59 (UTC).

Revitalizing Auto Communities v. National Grid USA

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 Revitalizing Auto Communities filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against National Grid USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1931

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

 

Party Details

Defendant

Chrysler Group LLC

Defendant / Appellees

National Grid USA

Thompson NW, LLC, 7050 Cedarbay Road Fayetteville, NY 13066

Amparit Industries, LLC

Northeast Management Services, Inc., c/o Florine Basile, Jr., President P.O. Box 1238 Cicero, NY 13039

Old Carco Liquidation Trust, By Its Trustee RJM I, LLC 251 Little Falls Drive Wilmington, DE 19808

251 Little Falls Drive

Wilmington, DE 19808

North Midler Properties LLC, 6041 Sewickley Drive Jamesville, NY 13078

John Does

Carrier Circle Business Complex LLC

ONX1 LLC

6181 Thompson Road, LLC

C & S Engineers, Inc.

Magna Powertrain USA, Inc.

Western Electric Company, Incorporated

BristolMeyers Squibb Company

Aleris Partners LLC

United States Hoffman Machinery Corporation, 105 Fourth Avenue New York, NY 10003

105 Fourth Avenue

New York, NY 10003

Northern Industrial Holdings, LLC, 1675 South State Street Suite B Dover, DE 19901

Syracuse Deere Road Associates, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

Racer Properties LLC

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John T. Kolaga Esq.

Attorney at Rupp Baase Pfalzgraf Cunningham LLC

1600 Liberty Building, 424 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14202

Lori E. Petrone Esq.

Attorney at Petrone, Petrone Law Firm

1624 Genesee Street

Utica, NY 13502

Douglas H. Zamelis Esq.

Attorney at Law Office of Douglas H. Zamelis

7629A State Highway 80

Cooperstown, NY 13104

Old Carco Liquidation Trust

251 Little Falls Drive

Wilmington, DE 19808

Michael A. Fogel Esq.

Attorney at Brown Duke & Fogel, P.C.

120 Madison Street, Axa Tower Ii

Syracuse, NY 13202

Donald William O'Brien Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman, LLP

1900 Bausch & Lomb Place

Rochester, NY 14604

John Joseph Kuster Esq.

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

787 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Bernard James Garbutt Esq. III

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

United States Hoffman Machinery Corporation

105 Fourth Avenue

New York, NY 10003

Melody D. Westfall Esq.

Attorney at Westfall Law PLLC

247 West Fayette Street

Syracuse, NY 13202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Alan Jon Knauf

Attorney at Knauf Shaw LLP

1400 Crossroads Building, 2 State Street

Rochester, NY 14614

Amy K. Kendall Esq.

Attorney at Knauf Shaw LLP

1400 Crossroads Building, 2 State Street

Rochester, NY 14614

Other Attorneys

Old Carco LLC

555 Chrysler Drive

Auburn Hills, MI 48236

Andrew C. Rose Esq.

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

677 Broadway

Albany, NY 12207

Peter V. Keays Esq.

Attorney at Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller

1 Logan Square

Philadelphia, PA 19103

James M. Gross Esq.

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Philip Gitlen Esq.

Attorney at Whiteman Osterman & Hanna LLP

1 Commerce Plaza

Albany, NY 12260

Gary S. Bowitch Esq.

Attorney at Bowitch & Coffey, LLC

17 Elk Street

Albany, NY 12207

Erick Matthew Sandler

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP

242 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103

Dean S. Sommer Esq.

Attorney at Young/Sommer LLC

Executive Woods, 5 Palisades Drive

Albany, NY 12205

22 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#128

#125

#124

123 #2

Supporting Document

123 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

#121

#120

#119

#117

#114

#113

#111

#108

#106

#103

#102

#100

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, on behalf of United States Hoffman Machinery Corporation, to USCA from USPS, RECEIVED.[2925075] [20-1931] [Entered: 09/08/2020 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) ATTORNEY, Linda R. Shaw for Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust and Racer Properties LLC, in case 20-1931 , [ # 125 ], ADDED.[2912792] [20-1931] [Entered: 08/20/2020 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust and Racer Properties LLC, FILED. Service date 08/20/2020 by CM/ECF. [2912768] [20-1931] [Entered: 08/20/2020 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee B&B Family Limited Partnership, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2907520] [20-1931] [Entered: 08/13/2020 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Northeast Management Services, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2901753] [20-1931] [Entered: 08/06/2020 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) ATTORNEY, Paul Sylvestri for Calocerinos and Spina C & S Engineers, Inc., in case 20-1931 , [ # 121 ], ADDED.[2900628] [20-1931] [Entered: 08/05/2020 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee C & S Engineers, Inc. and Calocerinos and Spina, FILED. Service date 08/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2900552] [20-1931] [Entered: 08/04/2020 06:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee C & S Engineers, Inc. and Calocerinos and Spina, FILED. Service date 08/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2900549] [20-1931] [Entered: 08/04/2020 06:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) NOTICE, to Appellee Aleris Partners LLC, Amparit Industries, LLC, B&B Family Limited Partnership, Burko Corporation, C & S Engineers, Inc., Calocerinos and Spina, Center Circles LLC, Empire Pipeline Corporation, Fulton Iron & Steel Co. Inc., Northeast Management Services, Inc., Old Carco LLC, Old Carco Liquidation Trust, Old Electric, Inc., Solvents and Petroleum Service, Inc. and United States Hoffman Machinery Corporation , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2900500] [20-1931] [Entered: 08/04/2020 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Racer Properties LLC and Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust Brief due date as 10/15/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 10/15/2020, FILED.[2895699] [20-1931] [Entered: 07/29/2020 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [14], on behalf of Appellant Racer Properties LLC and Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust, FILED.[2869071] [20-1931] [Entered: 06/23/2020 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Racer Properties LLC and Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust, FILED. Service date 06/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [2868592] [20-1931] [Entered: 06/23/2020 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellee Metalico New York, Inc. and Metalico Syracuse Realty, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2868020] [20-1931] [Entered: 06/22/2020 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Metalico New York, Inc. and Metalico Syracuse Realty, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2868017] [20-1931] [Entered: 06/22/2020 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE, to Appellee Fulton Iron & Steel Co. Inc., Old Carco LLC, Old Carco Liquidation Trust, Solvents and Petroleum Service, Inc. and United States Hoffman Machinery Corporation, regarding a corporation proceeding Pro Se, and requesting a response 30 days from the date of this letter, SENT.[2867753] [20-1931] [Entered: 06/22/2020 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Docket(#4) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Linda E. Alario, Esq. for Appellee Jagar Enterprises, Inc., Martha L. Berry, Esq. for Appellee Center Circles LLC, Gregory M. Brown, Esq. for Appellee Syracuse Deere Road Associates, LLC, Lauren Cole Daniel, Esq. for Appellee Honeywell International Inc., Daniel Flaherty, Esq. for Appellee Gardner Denver, Inc., John T. Kolaga, Esq. for Appellee Thompson Corners, LLC, 6181 Thompson Road, LLC, Thompson Lawn, LLC and Thompson NW, LLC, Edward A. O'Hara, Esq. for Appellee Hauler's Facility LLC, Melody D. Westfall, Esq. for Appellee Northern Industrial Holdings, LLC and Douglas H. Zamelis, Esq. for Appellee Northeast Management Services, Inc., informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2867724] [20-1931] [Entered: 06/22/2020 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • Docket(#7) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Racer Properties LLC and Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust, district court receipt # ANYNDC-5139298, FILED.[2867764] [20-1931] [Entered: 06/22/2020 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 05/12/2020, RECEIVED.[2867709] [20-1931] [Entered: 06/22/2020 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/12/2020, RECEIVED.[2867704] [20-1931] [Entered: 06/22/2020 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Racer Properties LLC and Revitalizing Auto Communities Environmental Response Trust, FILED. [2867627] [20-1931] [Entered: 06/22/2020 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Western Electric Company, Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where National Grid USA is a litigant

Latest cases where CHRYSLER GROUP LLC is a litigant