This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/19/2021 at 06:03:54 (UTC).

Resurrection School, et al v. Robert Gordon, et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 Resurrection School filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Robert Gordon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2256

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CAROL A. SIEMON, in her official capacity as the Ingham County Prosecuting Attorney

LINDA VAIL, in her official capacity as the Health Officer of Ingham County

DANA NESSEL, in her official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Michigan

ROBERT GORDON, in his official capacity as the Director of the Michigan Department of Health and Human Services

Plaintiff / Appellants

STEPHANIE SMITH, individially and as next friend on behalf of her minor child F.S. next friend of F.S.

CHRISTOPHER MIANECKI, individually and as next friend on behalf of his minor chilidren C.M., Z.M., and N.M. next friend of C.M. next friend of Z.M. next friend of N.M.

RESURRECTION SCHOOL

STEPHANIE SMITH, individually and as next friend on behalf of her minor child F.S.

CHRISTOPHER MIANECKI, individually and as next friend on behalf of his minor chilidren C.M., Z.M., and N.M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Bonnie G. Toskey

Attorney at Cohl, Stoker & Toskey

601 N. Capitol Avenue

Lansing, MI 48933

Sarah K. Osburn

Attorney at Cohl, Stoker & Toskey

601 N. Capitol Avenue

Lansing, MI 48933

Ann M. Sherman

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 30217

Lansing, MI 48909

Rebecca Ashley Berels

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 30217

Lansing, MI 48909

Daniel John Ping

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

2860 Eyde Parkway

East Lansing, MI 48823

Raymond O. Howd

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 30758

Lansing, MI 48909

Joseph T. Froehlich

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 30217

Lansing, MI 48909

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Erin Elizabeth Mersino

Attorney at Great Lakes Justice Center

5600 W. Mount Hope Highway

Lansing, MI 48917

Robert Joseph Muise

Attorney at American Freedom Law Center

P.O. Box 131098

Ann Arbor, MI 48113

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

11 #3

Additional Document

11 #2

Additional Document

11 #1

corporate disclosure

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Erin Elizabeth Mersino for Christopher Mianecki, Resurrection School and Stephanie Smith. Certificate of Service: 02/16/2021. Argument Request: requested. [20-2256] (EEM) [Entered: 02/16/2021 11:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Resurrection School and Stephanie Smith by Robert J. Muise. Certificate of Service: 02/15/2021. [20-2256] (RJM) [Entered: 02/15/2021 08:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/16/2021;. appellee brief due 03/17/2021; (VLP) [Entered: 01/06/2021 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Dana Nessel by Rebecca A. Berels. Certificate of Service: 01/06/2021. [20-2256] (RAB) [Entered: 01/06/2021 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Dana Nessel by Ann M. Sherman. Certificate of Service: 01/06/2021. [20-2256] (AMS) [Entered: 01/06/2021 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Erin Elizabeth Mersino for Appellants Christopher Mianecki, Resurrection School and Stephanie Smith Certificate of Service: 01/04/2021. [20-2256] (EEM) [Entered: 01/04/2021 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Erin Elizabeth Mersino for Appellants Christopher Mianecki, Resurrection School and Stephanie Smith.. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2021. [20-2256] (EEM) [Entered: 01/04/2021 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Christopher Mianecki, Resurrection School and Stephanie Smith by Erin Elizabeth Mersino. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2021. [20-2256] (EEM) [Entered: 01/04/2021 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Carol A. Siemon and Linda Vail by Sarah K. Osburn. Certificate of Service: 12/29/2020. [20-2256] (SKO) [Entered: 12/29/2020 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Bonnie G. Toskey for Appellees Carol A. Siemon and Linda Vail Certificate of Service: 12/29/2020. [20-2256] (BGT) [Entered: 12/29/2020 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Linda Vail and Carol A. Siemon by Bonnie G. Toskey. Certificate of Service: 12/29/2020. [20-2256] (BGT) [Entered: 12/29/2020 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Robert Gordon by Raymond O. Howd. Certificate of Service: 12/29/2020. [20-2256] (ROH) [Entered: 12/29/2020 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Robert Gordon by Joseph T. Froehlich. Certificate of Service: 12/29/2020. [20-2256] (JTF) [Entered: 12/29/2020 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Robert Gordon by Daniel J. Ping. Certificate of Service: 12/29/2020. [20-2256] (DJP) [Entered: 12/29/2020 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Virginia Padgett (VLP) [Entered: 12/21/2020 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Christopher Mianecki, Resurrection School and Stephanie Smith. Transcript needed: n. (VLP) [Entered: 12/21/2020 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert J. Muise

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin Elizabeth Mersino