This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/27/2022 at 06:22:48 (UTC).

RentGrow, Inc. v. Marco Fernandez

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 RentGrow, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Marco Fernandez. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-146

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RENTGROW, INC.

Respondent

MARCO A. FERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Joel Griswold

Suntrust Center, 200 South Orange Avenue

Orlando, FL 32801-3432

Louis Joseph Cannon Jr.

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Bonnie Keane DelGobbo

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

1 North Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-2841

Joel Christopher Griswold

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP

Suntrust Center, 200 South Orange Avenue

Orlando, FL 32801-3432

Maura K. Monaghan

Attorney at DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP

919 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Louis J. Cannon Jr.

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS PC

2800 Quarry Lake Drive

Baltimore, MD 21209

Respondent Attorneys

John G. Albanese

Attorney at BERGER MONTAGUE PC

1229 Tyler Street, Ne

Minneapolis, MN 55413

Joshua P. Davis

Attorney at BERGER MONTAGUE PC

59A Montford Avenue

Mill Valley, CA 94941

Eleanor Michelle Drake

Attorney at BERGER MONTAGUE PC

1229 Tyler Street, Ne

Minneapolis, MN 55413

Joseph C. Hashmall

Attorney at BERGER MONTAGUE PC

1229 Tyler Street, Ne

Minneapolis, MN 55413

Ariana Kiener

Attorney at BERGER MONTAGUE PC

1229 Tyler Street, Ne

Minneapolis, MN 55413

Martin Eugene Wolf

Attorney at GORDON & WOLF, CHTD

100 West Pennsylvania Avenue

Towson, MD 21204-0000

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) COURT ORDER filed granting Motion for permission to appeal [ # 2 ]. Case transferrred to regular docket number 22-1619. Copies to all parties. [1001174080] [22-146] JSN [Entered: 06/07/2022 01:43 PM]

#17

(#17) REPLY by RentGrow, Inc. to Motion [ # 15 ].. [1001151627] [22-146] Maura Monaghan [Entered: 04/25/2022 04:48 PM]

#16

(#16) COURT ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to file reply brief [ # 15 ]. Copies to all parties. [1001149682] [22-146] JSN [Entered: 04/21/2022 10:31 AM]

#15

(#15) MOTION by RentGrow, Inc. for leave to file memorandum response brief [ # 13 ]. Date and method of service: 04/18/2022 ecf. [1001147746] [22-146] Maura Monaghan [Entered: 04/18/2022 08:49 PM]

#14

(#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joel C. Griswold for RentGrow, Inc.. [1001145964] [22-146] Joel Griswold [Entered: 04/14/2022 12:24 PM]

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM RESPONSE BRIEF by Marco A. Fernandez. [1001143351] [22-146] Ariana Kiener [Entered: 04/11/2022 11:25 AM]

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ariana Kiener for Marco A. Fernandez. [1001139701] [22-146] Ariana Kiener [Entered: 04/04/2022 10:18 AM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joshua P. Davis for Marco A. Fernandez. [1001139286] [22-146] Joshua Davis [Entered: 04/01/2022 03:48 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by E. Michelle Drake for Marco A. Fernandez. [1001138813] [22-146] Eleanor Drake [Entered: 04/01/2022 10:19 AM]

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marco A. Fernandez. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001138810] [22-146] John Albanese [Entered: 04/01/2022 10:17 AM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John G. Albanese for Marco A. Fernandez. [1001138808] [22-146] John Albanese [Entered: 04/01/2022 10:16 AM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Maura K. Monaghan for RentGrow, Inc.. [1001136423] [22-146] Maura Monaghan [Entered: 03/29/2022 01:03 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo for RentGrow, Inc.. [1001135704] [22-146] Bonnie DelGobbo [Entered: 03/28/2022 04:35 PM]

#5

(#5) ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 4 ]. Number of days granted: 7. Response due 04/11/2022. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Louis Cannon, Jr., E. Drake, Joel Griswold & Joseph Hashmall. [1001135528] [22-146] TW [Entered: 03/28/2022 03:03 PM]

#4

(#4) MOTION by Marco A. Fernandez to extend filing time for response brief until April 11, 2022.. Date and method of service: 03/28/2022 ecf. [1001135427] [22-146] John Albanese [Entered: 03/28/2022 01:42 PM]

#3

(#3) RULE 5 NOTICE issued to Marco A. Fernandez requesting response to petition. Response due 04/04/2022. Mailed to: Louis Cannon, E. Michelle Drake, Joel Griswold, Joseph Hashmall, Ariana Kiener. [1001134383] [22-146] JSN [Entered: 03/25/2022 01:24 PM]

#2

Exhibits

2 #1

Petition for permission to appeal filed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • Docket(#19) Case transferred to general docket: [No. 22-1619]. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01190-JKB. [1001174082] [22-146] JSN [Entered: 06/07/2022 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) COURT ORDER filed granting Motion for permission to appeal [ # 2 ]. Case transferrred to regular docket number 22-1619. Copies to all parties. [1001174080] [22-146] JSN [Entered: 06/07/2022 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY by RentGrow, Inc. to Motion [ # 15 ].. [1001151627] [22-146] Maura Monaghan [Entered: 04/25/2022 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) COURT ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to file reply brief [ # 15 ]. Copies to all parties. [1001149682] [22-146] JSN [Entered: 04/21/2022 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION by RentGrow, Inc. for leave to file memorandum response brief [ # 13 ]. Date and method of service: 04/18/2022 ecf. [1001147746] [22-146] Maura Monaghan [Entered: 04/18/2022 08:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joel C. Griswold for RentGrow, Inc.. [1001145964] [22-146] Joel Griswold [Entered: 04/14/2022 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM RESPONSE BRIEF by Marco A. Fernandez. [1001143351] [22-146] Ariana Kiener [Entered: 04/11/2022 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ariana Kiener for Marco A. Fernandez. [1001139701] [22-146] Ariana Kiener [Entered: 04/04/2022 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joshua P. Davis for Marco A. Fernandez. [1001139286] [22-146] Joshua Davis [Entered: 04/01/2022 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by E. Michelle Drake for Marco A. Fernandez. [1001138813] [22-146] Eleanor Drake [Entered: 04/01/2022 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marco A. Fernandez. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001138810] [22-146] John Albanese [Entered: 04/01/2022 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John G. Albanese for Marco A. Fernandez. [1001138808] [22-146] John Albanese [Entered: 04/01/2022 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Maura K. Monaghan for RentGrow, Inc.. [1001136423] [22-146] Maura Monaghan [Entered: 03/29/2022 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo for RentGrow, Inc.. [1001135704] [22-146] Bonnie DelGobbo [Entered: 03/28/2022 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 4 ]. Number of days granted: 7. Response due 04/11/2022. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Louis Cannon, Jr., E. Drake, Joel Griswold & Joseph Hashmall. [1001135528] [22-146] TW [Entered: 03/28/2022 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Marco A. Fernandez to extend filing time for response brief until April 11, 2022.. Date and method of service: 03/28/2022 ecf. [1001135427] [22-146] John Albanese [Entered: 03/28/2022 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 5 NOTICE issued to Marco A. Fernandez requesting response to petition. Response due 04/04/2022. Mailed to: Louis Cannon, E. Michelle Drake, Joel Griswold, Joseph Hashmall, Ariana Kiener. [1001134383] [22-146] JSN [Entered: 03/25/2022 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Permission to appeal case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01190-JKB. Case manager: JeffNeal. [1001134234] [22-146] JSN [Entered: 03/25/2022 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Petition for permission to appeal filed by RentGrow, Inc.. [1001134379] [22-146] JSN [Entered: 03/25/2022 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rentgrow, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Gerard Albanese