This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/02/2019 at 05:12:31 (UTC).

Renewable Fuels Association, et al v. EPA

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 Renewable Fuels Association filed an Other lawsuit against EPA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1220

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Growth Energy

National Farmers Union

American Coalition for Ethanol

National Corn Growers Association

National Biodiesel Board

Renewable Fuels Association

Respondent

Environmental Protection Agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

David Lehn

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1420

Claire Hyungyo Chung

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1420

Saurabh Sanghvi

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1420

Seth Paul Waxman

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1420

Matthew W. Morrison Esquire

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

1200 Seventeenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-3006

Cynthia Cook Robertson

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

1200 Seventeenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-3006

Bryan Stockton

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

1200 Seventeenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-3006

Respondent Attorney

Samara Michelle Spence

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7415

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1813300] filed by Samara M. Spence on behalf of Respondent EPA. [19-1220] (Spence, Samara) [Entered: 10/30/2019 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1812595] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 11/25/2019. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 11/25/2019. PETITIONER statement of issues due 11/25/2019. PETITIONER underlying decision due 11/25/2019. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 11/25/2019. PETITIONER procedural motions due 11/25/2019. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 12/09/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 11/25/2019. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 11/25/2019. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 12/09/2019. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 12/09/2019 [19-1220] [Entered: 10/25/2019 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1812538] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1812533-2 ] [19-1220] [Entered: 10/25/2019 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1812533] of a decision by federal agency filed by American Coalition for Ethanol, Growth Energy, National Biodiesel Board, National Corn Growers Association, National Farmers Union and Renewable Fuels Association [Service Date: 10/22/2019 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [19-1220] [Entered: 10/25/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [19-1220] [Entered: 10/25/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Biodiesel Board is a litigant

Latest cases where Renewable Fuels Association is a litigant