This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/25/2021 at 06:04:20 (UTC).

Ministeri v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 Ministeri filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1652

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

 

Party Details

Defendant

AECOM TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

Plaintiff / Appellant

RENEE MINISTERI, Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Ministeri

Defendant / Appellee

RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Colleen C. Cook

Attorney at Smolak & Vaughan LLP

21 High St, Ste 301

North Andover, MA 01845

Deborah Higashi Dodge

Attorney at Nystrom Beckman & Paris LLP

1 Marina Park Dr, 15Th Flr

Boston, MA 02210

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Richard J. Sullivan

Attorney at Sullivan & Sullivan, LLP

83 Walnut St, Ste 100

Wellesley, MA 02481-0000

Teresa A. Monroe

Attorney at Monroe Law LLP

90 State St, Ste 700

Albany, NY 12207

Eugene F. Sullivan Jr.

Attorney at Sullivan & Sullivan, LLP

83 Walnut St, Ste 100

Wellesley, MA 02481-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Joshua Bachrach

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP

2 Commerce Sq., 2001 Market St St 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Kara G. Thorvaldsen

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

260 Franklin St, 14Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-3112

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge; Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge and David J. Barron, Appellate Judge. Appellant Reliance Standard Insurance Company's "motion to consolidate appeals" is resolved as follows. Consistent with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 28.1 and other relevant rules, Appeal Nos. 21-1651 and 21-1652 will proceed as cross-appeals. The clerk shall set a crossappeal briefing schedule in the ordinary course. To the extent appellant seeks to consolidate the cross-appeals with related Appeal No. 21-1174, that request is denied as moot in light of the judgment of even date entered in Appeal No. 21-1174. [21-1651, 21-1174, 21-1652] (GB) [Entered: 10/22/2021 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Eugene F. Sullivan, Jr. for Renee Ministeri. [21-1652] (GB) [Entered: 09/27/2021 05:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Renee Ministeri indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 09/22/2021. [21-1652] (TAM) [Entered: 09/22/2021 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Renee Ministeri. Certificate of service dated 09/14/2021. [21-1652] (TAM) [Entered: 09/14/2021 05:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Renee Ministeri filed by Attorney Teresa A Monroe. Certificate of service dated 09/14/2021. [21-1652] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional cases 21-1651, 21-1174. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required in case 21-1652. Case number and party designation is different is each case, 21-1651 and 21-1174. Counsel should file a corrected appearance form in each according case separately. (TAM) [Entered: 09/14/2021 05:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 09/24/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Teresa A. Monroe for Renee Ministeri and Eugene F. Sullivan, Jr. for Renee Ministeri. [21-1652] (GB) [Entered: 09/10/2021 07:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript report/order form due 09/24/2021 . [21-1652] (GB) [Entered: 09/10/2021 07:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to consolidate cases filed by Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company in 21-1174, 21-1651, Appellee Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company in 21-1652. Certificate of service dated 09/01/2021. [21-1174, 21-1651, 21-1652] (JB) [Entered: 09/01/2021 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company filed by Attorney Joshua Bachrach. Certificate of service dated 08/27/2021. [21-1652] (JB) [Entered: 08/27/2021 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #78) filed by Appellant Renee Ministeri. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 09/09/2021 . [21-1652] (GB) [Entered: 08/26/2021 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AECOM TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company is a litigant