This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2020 at 06:05:16 (UTC).

Renat Takhtakhunov v. Director New York Field Office

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 Renat Takhtakhunov filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Director New York Field Office. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2811

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

DIRECTOR NEW YORK FIELD OFFICE IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

ATTORNEY GENERAL UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

WARDEN BERGEN COUNTY JAIL

Plaintiff / Appellee

RENAT TAKHTAKHUNOV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Enes Hajdarpasic Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

J. Andrew Ruymann Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

402 East State Street

Trenton, NJ 08608

Alex D. Silagi Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

Catherine Reno Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Steven A. Asher Esq.

Attorney at Law Office of Craig Relles

12 Water Street, Suite 201

White Plains, NY 10601

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

District Court Order 7/8/20

1 #3

District Court Opinion 7/8/20

1 #4

Caption

1 #5

Civil Counsel Habeas Letter

#3

4 #1

Concise Summary of the Case

4 #2

Attachment 1: District Court Opinion

4 #3

Attachment 2: District Court Order

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Steven A. Asher, Esq. for Renat Takhtakhunov requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 11/10/2020. (TMK) [Entered: 10/27/2020 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Steven A. Asher, Esq. for Renat Takhtakhunov requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form within 14 days. (TMK) [Entered: 09/25/2020 08:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Attorney General United States of America, Director New York Field Office Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security and Warden Bergen County Jail. [20-2811] (CR) [Entered: 09/15/2020 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Attorney General United States of America, Director New York Field Office Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security and Warden Bergen County Jail. [20-2811] (CR) [Entered: 09/15/2020 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Catherine Reno on behalf of Appellant(s) Thomas Decker, William P. Barr, Chad Wolf, Steven Ahrendt, in their official capacities. [20-2811] (CR) [Entered: 09/15/2020 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMK) [Entered: 09/10/2020 07:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Attorney General United States of America, Director New York Field Office Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security and Warden Bergen County Jail in District Court No. 2-20-cv-04658. (TMK) [Entered: 09/10/2020 07:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECTOR NEW YORK FIELD OFFICE IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY is a litigant