This case was last updated from PACER on 06/27/2020 at 05:21:32 (UTC).

Renasant Bank Inc. v. Landcastle Acquisition Corp.

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 Renasant Bank Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Landcastle Acquisition Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-90013

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RENASANT BANK INC.

Respondent

LANDCASTLE ACQUISITION CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Robert F. Parsley

Attorney at Miller & Martin, PLLC

1200 Volunteer Bldg, 832 Georgia Ave

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Michael Paul Kohler

Attorney at Miller & Martin, PLLC

1180 West Peachtree St Nw Ste 2100

Atlanta, GA 30309

Respondent Attorneys

Edward Henry Wasmuth Jr.

Attorney at Smith Gambrell & Russell, LLP

1230 Peachtree St Ste 3100

Atlanta, GA 30309

David C. Newman

Attorney at Smith Gambrell & Russell, LLP

1230 Peachtree St Ste 3100

Atlanta, GA 30309

Benjamin E. Reed

Attorney at Smith Gambrell & Russell, LLP

1230 Peachtree St Ste 3100

Atlanta, GA 30309

Edward D. Burch Jr.

Attorney at Smith Gambrell & Russell, LLP

1230 Peachtree St Ste 3100

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

Open Document

RESPONSE to Petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 1292(b) filed by Petitioner Renasant Bank Inc. [ # 9116458-2 ] filed by Attorney Edward Henry Wasmuth, Jr. for Respondent Landcastle Acquisition Corp.. [20-90013] (ECF: Edward Wasmuth) [Entered: 06/26/2020 09:28 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Edward Henry Wasmuth, Jr. for Respondent Landcastle Acquisition Corp.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-90013] (ECF: Edward Wasmuth) [Entered: 06/26/2020 09:09 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edward D. Burch, Jr. for Landcastle Acquisition Corp.. [20-90013] (ECF: Edward Burch) [Entered: 06/22/2020 02:31 PM]

Open Document

AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Robert F. Parsley for Renasant Bank Attorney Robert F. Parsley for Petitioner Renasant Bank Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-90013] (ECF: Robert Parsley) [Entered: 06/19/2020 02:01 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Paul Kohler for Renasant Bank Inc.. [20-90013] (ECF: Michael Kohler) [Entered: 06/19/2020 12:32 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert F. Parsley for Renasant Bank Robert F. Parsley for Renasant Bank Inc.. [20-90013] (ECF: Robert Parsley) [Entered: 06/19/2020 12:23 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edward H. Wasmuth, Jr. for Respondent [20-90013] (ECF: Edward Wasmuth) [Entered: 06/19/2020 10:36 AM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Petitioner Renasant Bank Inc.. [Entered: 06/19/2020 10:07 AM]

Open Document #2

MOT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Miscellaneous Petition Docketed - Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE to Petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 1292(b) filed by Petitioner Renasant Bank Inc. [ # 9116458-2 ] filed by Attorney Edward Henry Wasmuth, Jr. for Respondent Landcastle Acquisition Corp.. [20-90013] (ECF: Edward Wasmuth) [Entered: 06/26/2020 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Edward Henry Wasmuth, Jr. for Respondent Landcastle Acquisition Corp.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-90013] (ECF: Edward Wasmuth) [Entered: 06/26/2020 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edward D. Burch, Jr. for Landcastle Acquisition Corp.. [20-90013] (ECF: Edward Burch) [Entered: 06/22/2020 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Robert F. Parsley for Renasant Bank Attorney Robert F. Parsley for Petitioner Renasant Bank Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-90013] (ECF: Robert Parsley) [Entered: 06/19/2020 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Paul Kohler for Renasant Bank Inc.. [20-90013] (ECF: Michael Kohler) [Entered: 06/19/2020 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert F. Parsley for Renasant Bank Robert F. Parsley for Renasant Bank Inc.. [20-90013] (ECF: Robert Parsley) [Entered: 06/19/2020 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edward H. Wasmuth, Jr. for Respondent [20-90013] (ECF: Edward Wasmuth) [Entered: 06/19/2020 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Petitioner Renasant Bank Inc.. [Entered: 06/19/2020 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANEOUS CASE DOCKETED. Petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 1292(b) filed by Petitioner Renasant Bank Inc.. Served 06/18/2020 email - Attorney for Respondents: Burch, Newman; US mail - Attorney for Respondent: Reed. [Entered: 06/19/2020 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDCASTLE ACQUISITION CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where RENASANT BANK is a litigant