This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2019 at 06:04:51 (UTC).

Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC v. City of Fort Wayne, Indiana

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against City of Fort Wayne, Indiana. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2250

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

RENAL CARE GROUP INDIANA, LLC

Defendant / Appellee

CITY OF FORT WAYNE, INDIANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Brian D. Schneider

Attorney at ARENT FOX LLP

1717 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Matthew James Anderson

Attorney at TABOR LAW FIRM

3610 River Crossing Parkway

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Robert M. Chemers

Attorney at PRETZEL & STOUFFER, CHARTERED

One S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-4673

James F. Bennett

Attorney at DOWD BENNETT LLP

7733 Forsyth Boulevard

St. Louis, MO 63105-0000

James Joseph Sipchen

Attorney at PRETZEL & STOUFFER, CHARTERED

One S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-4673

Caroline English

Attorney at ARENT FOX LLP

1717 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Marc W. Sciscoe

Attorney at ICE MILLER LLP

One American Square

Indianapolis, IN 46282-0200

Derek Read Molter

Attorney at ICE MILLER LLP

One American Square

Indianapolis, IN 46282-0200

Michael A. Wukmer

Attorney at ICE MILLER LLP

One American Square

Indianapolis, IN 46282-0200

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. Paper copies due on 09/03/2019 Electronically Transmitted. [15] [7025979] [19-2250] (DRS) [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:41 PM]

#14

(#14) Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Caroline Turner English for Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [14] [7025940] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [19-2250] (Bennett, James) [Entered: 08/26/2019 02:43 PM]

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney James J. Sipchen for Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [12] [7025602] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2250]--[Edited 08/23/2019 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Sipchen, James) [Entered: 08/23/2019 02:05 PM]

#11

(#11) Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert Marc Chemers for Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [11] [7025592] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2250]--[Edited 08/23/2019 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Chemers, Robert) [Entered: 08/23/2019 01:54 PM]

#10

(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney James F. Bennett for Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [10] [7025086] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2250] --[Edited 08/22/2019 by AP- to reflect the addition of counsel] (Bennett, James) [Entered: 08/22/2019 07:42 AM]

#9

(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brian D. Schneider for Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [9] [7019757] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2250] (Schneider, Brian) [Entered: 07/26/2019 10:56 AM]

#8

(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Caroline Turner English for Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [8] [7019752] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2250] [Edited 07/26/2019 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (English, Caroline) [Entered: 07/26/2019 10:51 AM]

#7

(#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 08/26/2019 for Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. Appellee's brief due on or before 09/25/2019 for City of Fort Wayne, Indiana. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/16/2019 for Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. RJS [7016331] [19-2250] (FP) [Entered: 07/10/2019 10:57 AM]

#6

(#6) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Wednesday, July 24, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [6] [7016330] [19-2250] (FP) [Entered: 07/10/2019 10:55 AM]

5 #2

Certificate of Service

5 #1

Transcript Information Sheet

4 #2

Certificate of Service

4 #1

Disclosure Statement/Appearance

3 #2

Certificate of Service

3 #1

Disclosure Statement/Appearance

#2

(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Derek R. Molter, Michael A. Wukmer, Marc W. Sciscoe for Appellee City of Fort Wayne, Indiana. [2] [7015217] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2250] [Edited 07/03/2019 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Molter, Derek) [Entered: 07/03/2019 09:22 AM]

#1

Civil Case

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • (#16) Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [16] [7026494] [19-2250] (DRS) [Entered: 08/28/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. Paper copies due on 09/03/2019 Electronically Transmitted. [15] [7025979] [19-2250] (DRS) [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Caroline Turner English for Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [14] [7025940] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [19-2250] (Bennett, James) [Entered: 08/26/2019 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Submitted appellant brief by James F. Bennett, Caroline Turner English, Brian D. Schneider, Robert Marc Chemers & James J. Sipchen for Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [13] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7025938] [19-2250] (Bennett, James) [Entered: 08/26/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney James J. Sipchen for Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [12] [7025602] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2250]--[Edited 08/23/2019 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Sipchen, James) [Entered: 08/23/2019 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert Marc Chemers for Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [11] [7025592] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2250]--[Edited 08/23/2019 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Chemers, Robert) [Entered: 08/23/2019 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney James F. Bennett for Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [10] [7025086] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2250] --[Edited 08/22/2019 by AP- to reflect the addition of counsel] (Bennett, James) [Entered: 08/22/2019 07:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brian D. Schneider for Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [9] [7019757] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2250] (Schneider, Brian) [Entered: 07/26/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Caroline Turner English for Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [8] [7019752] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2250] [Edited 07/26/2019 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (English, Caroline) [Entered: 07/26/2019 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 08/26/2019 for Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. Appellee's brief due on or before 09/25/2019 for City of Fort Wayne, Indiana. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/16/2019 for Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. RJS [7016331] [19-2250] (FP) [Entered: 07/10/2019 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Wednesday, July 24, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [6] [7016330] [19-2250] (FP) [Entered: 07/10/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [5] [7015413] [19-2250] (Sipchen, James) [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney James J. Sipchen for Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [4] [7015406] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2250] --[Edited 07/03/2019 by AP- to reflect the addition of counsel] (Sipchen, James) [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert Marc Chemers for Appellant Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [3] [7015397] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [19-2250] (Chemers, Robert) [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Derek R. Molter, Michael A. Wukmer, Marc W. Sciscoe for Appellee City of Fort Wayne, Indiana. [2] [7015217] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2250] [Edited 07/03/2019 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Molter, Derek) [Entered: 07/03/2019 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 07/15/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 08/12/2019 for Renal Care Group Indiana, LLC. [1] [7014780] [19-2250] (FP) [Entered: 07/01/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less