This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/02/2020 at 06:17:19 (UTC).

Relyant Global, LLC v. US

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 Relyant Global, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1526

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

RELYANT GLOBAL, LLC

Defendant / Appellee

UNITED STATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James Henry Price

Attorney at Lacy, Price & Wagner, PC

249 N Peters Road, Suite 101

Knoxville, TN 37923

Michael Ryan Franz

Attorney at Lacy, Price & Wagner, PC

249 N Peters Road, Suite 101

Knoxville, TN 37923

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Sheryl L. Floyd Esq.

Attorney at Department of Justice

1100 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#8

#7

#6

5 #2

Certificate of Service

5 #1

Docketing Statement

4 #2

Certificate of Service

4 #1

Certificate of Interest

3 #2

Certificate of Service

3 #1

Entry of Appearance

#2

Certificate of Service

2 #1

Entry of Appearance

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MODIFIED ENTRY: BRIEF FILED for Appellant Relyant Global, LLC. Number of Pages: 25. Service: 04/21/2020 by email. Unless ordered otherwise, any responsive deadline runs from the date of service of this brief. See Fed. Cir. R. 31. [688669]--[Edited 04/22/2020 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [James Price] [Entered: 04/21/2020 12:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellee US. Service: 04/02/2020 by email. [683771] [20-1526] [Sheryl Floyd] [Entered: 04/02/2020 02:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for Sheryl L. Floyd as principal counsel for Appellee US. Service: 03/17/2020 by email. [679519] [20-1526] [Sheryl Floyd] [Entered: 03/17/2020 02:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Relyant Global, LLC. Service: 03/06/2020 by email. [676930] [20-1526] [James Price] [Entered: 03/06/2020 11:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Relyant Global, LLC. Service: 03/06/2020 by email. [676927] [20-1526] [James Price] [Entered: 03/06/2020 11:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Michael R. Franz as of counsel for Appellant Relyant Global, LLC. Service: 03/06/2020 by email. [676861] [20-1526] [Michael Franz] [Entered: 03/06/2020 10:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for James H. Price as principal counsel for Appellant Relyant Global, LLC. Service: 03/06/2020 by email. [676849] [20-1526] [James Price] [Entered: 03/06/2020 10:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 02/24/2020. [675839] Entry of Appearance due 03/17/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/17/2020. Docketing Statement due 04/02/2020. Appellant's brief is due 05/04/2020. [MMA] [Entered: 03/03/2020 12:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Relyant Global, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant