This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2019 at 06:06:37 (UTC).

Rellstab v. Ditech Financial LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 Rellstab filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Ditech Financial LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1882

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DITECH FINANCIAL, LLC, f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC

ORLANS, PC

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC

ORLANS P.C.

Plaintiff / Appellant

CARL W. RELLSTAB

Worcester, MA 01605

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Amy B. Hackett

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC

2 International Pl, 16Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-2602

Michael R. Hagopian

Attorney at Brock & Scott

1080 Main St, Ste 200

Pawtucket, RI 02860

Effie Gikas Tchobanian

Attorney at Orlans PC

465 Waverley Oaks Rd, Ste 401

Waltham, MA 02452

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Carl W. Rellstab

40 Laurel St

Worcester, MA 01605

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Form 4

Open Document #1

Order

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated District Court Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss for failure to pay the filing fee. Fee due 11/21/2019. [19-1882] (GK) [Entered: 11/07/2019 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 10/28/2019 for appellant Carl W. Rellstab. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1882] (CMP) [Entered: 09/16/2019 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #16) filed by Appellant Carl W. Rellstab. Fee due 09/25/2019.. [19-1882] (CMP) [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less