This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2020 at 06:07:18 (UTC).

Rejeanne Bernier, et al v. Ricardo Lara, et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Rejeanne Bernier filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Ricardo Lara. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55160

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

REJEANNE BERNIER

San Diego, CA 92119

HANS S. CROTEAU, as individuals, and as members of a similarly situated class

San Diego, CA 92119

Defendant / Appellees

RICARDO LARA, in his capacity as California Insurance Commissioner

DOES, 1 Through 10 inclusive

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Rejeanne Bernier

6792 Maury Drive

San Diego, CA 92119

Hans S. Croteau

6792 Maury Drive

San Diego, CA 92119

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Laura Robbins

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

300 South Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): The appellees unopposed motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 8 ]) to reset the briefing schedule is granted. The opening brief has been filed. The answering brief is due June 9, 2020. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11658165] (OC) [Entered: 04/10/2020 05:02 PM]

#9

(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellant Ms. Rejeanne Bernier response joining motion ([ # 8 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 8 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 03/18/2020. [11633998] [20-55160] (Bernier, Rejeanne) [Entered: 03/18/2020 12:45 PM]

#8

(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellees California Department of Insurance and Ricardo Lara Motion to file supplemental brief. Date of service: 03/18/2020. [11633711] [20-55160] (Robbins, Laura) [Entered: 03/18/2020 11:08 AM]

#7

(#7) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 4 ] and excerpts of record [ # 5 ] submitted by Ms. Rejeanne Bernier and Hans S. Croteau are filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11630962] (SML) [Entered: 03/16/2020 12:10 PM]

6 #2

Additional Document

6 #1

Main Document

#5

(#5) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Ms. Rejeanne Bernier and Hans S. Croteau. Date of service: 03/16/2020. [11630837] [20-55160] (Bernier, Rejeanne) [Entered: 03/16/2020 11:27 AM]

#4

(#4) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Ms. Rejeanne Bernier and Hans S. Croteau. Date of service: 03/16/2020. [11630828] [20-55160] (Bernier, Rejeanne) [Entered: 03/16/2020 11:24 AM]

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): The appellees unopposed motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 8 ]) to reset the briefing schedule is granted. The opening brief has been filed. The answering brief is due June 9, 2020. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11658165] (OC) [Entered: 04/10/2020 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellant Ms. Rejeanne Bernier response joining motion ([ # 8 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 8 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 03/18/2020. [11633998] [20-55160] (Bernier, Rejeanne) [Entered: 03/18/2020 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellees California Department of Insurance and Ricardo Lara Motion to file supplemental brief. Date of service: 03/18/2020. [11633711] [20-55160] (Robbins, Laura) [Entered: 03/18/2020 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 4 ] and excerpts of record [ # 5 ] submitted by Ms. Rejeanne Bernier and Hans S. Croteau are filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11630962] (SML) [Entered: 03/16/2020 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant Ms. Rejeanne Bernier Motion to take judicial notice of. Date of service: 03/16/2020. [11630872] [20-55160] (Bernier, Rejeanne) [Entered: 03/16/2020 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Ms. Rejeanne Bernier and Hans S. Croteau. Date of service: 03/16/2020. [11630837] [20-55160] (Bernier, Rejeanne) [Entered: 03/16/2020 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Ms. Rejeanne Bernier and Hans S. Croteau. Date of service: 03/16/2020. [11630828] [20-55160] (Bernier, Rejeanne) [Entered: 03/16/2020 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Laura Robbins for party(s) Appellee Ricardo Lara Appellee California Department of Insurance. [11600533] (RL) [Entered: 02/18/2020 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Laura E. Robbins (California Department of Justice, 300 S. Spring Street, Suite 1702, Los Angeles, CA 90013) for Appellees California Department of Insurance and Ricardo Lara. Date of service: 02/18/2020. (Party was previously proceeding pro se.) [11600279] [20-55160] (Robbins, Laura) [Entered: 02/18/2020 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANTS AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Rejeanne Bernier and Hans S. Croteau opening brief due 04/10/2020. [11597085] (JBS) [Entered: 02/13/2020 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less