This case was last updated from PACER on 04/07/2019 at 06:06:09 (UTC).

Reid Lininger v. St. Marys City School Dist, et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 Reid Lininger filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against St Marys City School Dist. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3100

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

SHAWN BROWN, individually and as Superintendent of St. Marys City Schools

PAUL DOUGLAS FRYE, individually and as Head Football Coach of St. Marys City Schools also known as Doug Frye

ST. MARYS CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION

JAMES HOLLMAN, individually and as Athletic Director of St. Marys City Schools

Plaintiff / Appellant

REID LININGER, former student-athlete of St. Marys City Schools

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Tabitha D. Justice

Attorney at Subashi & Wildermuth

50 Chestnut Street, Suite 230

Dayton, OH 45440

Brian L. Wildermuth

Attorney at Subashi & Wildermuth

50 Chestnut Street, Suite 230

Dayton, OH 45440

Amy J. Luck

Attorney at Robison, Curphey & O'Connell

433 N. Summit Street, Ninth Floor

Toledo, OH 43604

Robert C. Tucker

Attorney at Tucker Ellis

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

William V. Beach

Attorney at Robison, Curphey & O'Connell

433 N. Summit Street, Ninth Floor

Toledo, OH 43604

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Mark Anthony Weiker

Attorney at Albeit Weiker

262 S. Third Street

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) RULING LETTER SENT granting appellant's motion to extend time to file brief by 45 days [ # 13 ] filed by Mr. Mark Anthony Weiker. Resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 05/06/2019. Appellee brief now due 06/05/2019. (MMP) [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:01 AM]

#13

(#13) MOTION filed by Mr. Mark Anthony Weiker for Reid Lininger to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 03/01/2019. [19-3100] (MAW) [Entered: 03/01/2019 09:40 AM]

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Amy J. Luck for Appellee Paul Douglas Frye Certificate of Service: 02/20/2019. [19-3100] (AJL) [Entered: 02/20/2019 02:36 PM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Paul Douglas Frye by William V. Beach. Certificate of Service: 02/20/2019. [19-3100] (WVB) [Entered: 02/20/2019 02:28 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Paul Douglas Frye by Amy J. Luck. Certificate of Service: 02/20/2019. [19-3100] (AJL) [Entered: 02/20/2019 02:19 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Shawn Brown, James Hollman and St. Marys City School District Board Of Education by Brian L. Wildermuth. Certificate of Service: 02/19/2019. [19-3100] (BLW) [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:24 PM]

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Brian L. Wildermuth for Appellees Shawn Brown, James Hollman and St. Marys City School District Board Of Education Certificate of Service: 02/19/2019. [19-3100] (BLW) [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:00 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Shawn Brown, James Hollman and St. Marys City School District Board Of Education by Tabitha Justice. Certificate of Service: 02/19/2019. [19-3100] (TDJ) [Entered: 02/19/2019 11:52 AM]

#6

(#6) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 03/20/2019;. appellee brief due 04/19/2019; (JE) [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:14 AM]

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Mark Anthony Weiker for Appellant Reid Lininger Certificate of Service: 02/08/2019. [19-3100] (MAW) [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:06 AM]

#4

(#4) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Mark Anthony Weiker for Appellant Reid Lininger. Certificate of Service:02/08/2019. [19-3100] (MAW) [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:04 AM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Reid Lininger by Mark A. Weiker. Certificate of Service: 02/08/2019. [19-3100] (MAW) [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:02 AM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Reid Lininger. Transcript needed: n. (MMP) [Entered: 02/06/2019 03:46 PM]

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RULING LETTER SENT granting appellant's motion to extend time to file brief by 45 days [ # 13 ] filed by Mr. Mark Anthony Weiker. Resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 05/06/2019. Appellee brief now due 06/05/2019. (MMP) [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION filed by Mr. Mark Anthony Weiker for Reid Lininger to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 03/01/2019. [19-3100] (MAW) [Entered: 03/01/2019 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Amy J. Luck for Appellee Paul Douglas Frye Certificate of Service: 02/20/2019. [19-3100] (AJL) [Entered: 02/20/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Paul Douglas Frye by William V. Beach. Certificate of Service: 02/20/2019. [19-3100] (WVB) [Entered: 02/20/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Paul Douglas Frye by Amy J. Luck. Certificate of Service: 02/20/2019. [19-3100] (AJL) [Entered: 02/20/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Shawn Brown, James Hollman and St. Marys City School District Board Of Education by Brian L. Wildermuth. Certificate of Service: 02/19/2019. [19-3100] (BLW) [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Brian L. Wildermuth for Appellees Shawn Brown, James Hollman and St. Marys City School District Board Of Education Certificate of Service: 02/19/2019. [19-3100] (BLW) [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Shawn Brown, James Hollman and St. Marys City School District Board Of Education by Tabitha Justice. Certificate of Service: 02/19/2019. [19-3100] (TDJ) [Entered: 02/19/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 03/20/2019;. appellee brief due 04/19/2019; (JE) [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Mark Anthony Weiker for Appellant Reid Lininger Certificate of Service: 02/08/2019. [19-3100] (MAW) [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Mark Anthony Weiker for Appellant Reid Lininger. Certificate of Service:02/08/2019. [19-3100] (MAW) [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Reid Lininger by Mark A. Weiker. Certificate of Service: 02/08/2019. [19-3100] (MAW) [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Monica Page (MMP) [Entered: 02/06/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Reid Lininger. Transcript needed: n. (MMP) [Entered: 02/06/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less