This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2020 at 06:03:57 (UTC).

Rehan Hashmi, et al v. 7-Eleven, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 Rehan Hashmi filed an Other lawsuit against 7-Eleven, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1371

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

7-ELEVEN, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellants

REHAN S. HASHMI

LYKOR SHACK INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John F. Verhey

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP (US)

444 W. Lake Street

Chicago, IL 60606

Norman M. Leon

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP (US)

444 W. Lake Street

Chicago, IL 60606

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Carmen D. Caruso

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF CARMEN D. CARUSO

77 W. Washington Street

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [8] JNS [7073470] [20-1371] (AP) [Entered: 04/08/2020 08:39 AM]

#7

(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John F. Verhey for Appellee 7-Eleven, Inc.. [7] [7070854] [20-1371] (JAD) [Entered: 03/25/2020 04:03 PM]

#6

(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Norman M. Leon for party Appellee 7-Eleven, Inc., in case 20-1371. Added Attorney Norman M. Leon for party Appellee 7-Eleven, Inc., in case 20-1371 per disclosure statement. [6] [7070853] [20-1371] (JAD) [Entered: 03/25/2020 04:02 PM]

#5

(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Carmen D. Caruso and James C. Stevens, Jr. for Appellants Rehan S. Hashmi and Lykor Shack Inc.. [5] [7068828] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1371] (Caruso, Carmen) [Entered: 03/16/2020 06:04 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Rehan S. Hashmi and Lykor Shack Inc.. [4] [7068813] [20-1371] (Caruso, Carmen) [Entered: 03/16/2020 04:51 PM]

#3

(#3) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/20/2020 for Rehan S. Hashmi and Lykor Shack Inc.. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/20/2020 for 7-Eleven, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/10/2020 for Appellants Rehan S. Hashmi and Lykor Shack Inc. JNS [7067421] [20-1371] (FP) [Entered: 03/09/2020 10:18 AM]

#2

(#2) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted in Room 1120, Friday, March 20, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [2] [7067418] [20-1371] (FP) [Entered: 03/09/2020 10:08 AM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [8] JNS [7073470] [20-1371] (AP) [Entered: 04/08/2020 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John F. Verhey for Appellee 7-Eleven, Inc.. [7] [7070854] [20-1371] (JAD) [Entered: 03/25/2020 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Norman M. Leon for party Appellee 7-Eleven, Inc., in case 20-1371. Added Attorney Norman M. Leon for party Appellee 7-Eleven, Inc., in case 20-1371 per disclosure statement. [6] [7070853] [20-1371] (JAD) [Entered: 03/25/2020 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Carmen D. Caruso and James C. Stevens, Jr. for Appellants Rehan S. Hashmi and Lykor Shack Inc.. [5] [7068828] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1371] (Caruso, Carmen) [Entered: 03/16/2020 06:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Rehan S. Hashmi and Lykor Shack Inc.. [4] [7068813] [20-1371] (Caruso, Carmen) [Entered: 03/16/2020 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/20/2020 for Rehan S. Hashmi and Lykor Shack Inc.. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/20/2020 for 7-Eleven, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/10/2020 for Appellants Rehan S. Hashmi and Lykor Shack Inc. JNS [7067421] [20-1371] (FP) [Entered: 03/09/2020 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted in Room 1120, Friday, March 20, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [2] [7067418] [20-1371] (FP) [Entered: 03/09/2020 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 03/18/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/13/2020 for Rehan S. Hashmi and Lykor Shack Inc. [1] [7066597] [20-1371] (ER) [Entered: 03/04/2020 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 7-Eleven Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carmen David Caruso