This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/26/2020 at 06:20:04 (UTC).

Reginald Myers v. USA

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 Reginald Myers filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3798

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

REGINALD S. MYERS

Ashland, KY 41105

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Reginald S. Myers

Attorney at F.C.I. Ashland

P.O. Box 6001

Ashland, KY 41105

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Kenneth L. Parker

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney

221 E. Fourth Street, Suite 400

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

5 #2

judge order filed

5 #1

Cover Letter

#4

(#4) RESPONSE filed to the show cause for jurisdiction - late noa, [ # 3 ]. Response filed by Party Reginald S. Myers. Certificate of Service:08/18/2020. (CAM) [Entered: 08/18/2020 01:00 PM]

3 #2

show cause order filed

3 #1

Cover Letter

#1

(#1) Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability pending in District Court. Notice filed by Appellant Reginald S. Myers. Transcript needed: n. (CAM) [Entered: 07/28/2020 02:09 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER filed : we REMAND this case to the district court for a determination as to whether Myerss time for filing a notice of appeal should be reopened. While on limited remand, Myerss appeal is held in abeyance. Upon ruling, the district court shall return the case to this court for such further proceedings as may be appropriate. Julia Smith Gibbons, Circuit Judge. (CAM) [Entered: 09/10/2020 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE filed to the show cause for jurisdiction - late noa, [ # 3 ]. Response filed by Party Reginald S. Myers. Certificate of Service:08/18/2020. (CAM) [Entered: 08/18/2020 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SHOW CAUSE order filed to have Appellant Reginald S. Myers show cause for possible jurisdictional defect involving the filing of a late notice of appeal and to hold briefing in abeyance. Response due by 08/28/2020 for Reginald S. Myers. (CAM) [Entered: 08/07/2020 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 07/28/2020 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability pending in District Court. Notice filed by Appellant Reginald S. Myers. Transcript needed: n. (CAM) [Entered: 07/28/2020 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth R. L. Parker