This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:00:46 (UTC).

Reginald Brown v. T.G. Werlich

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Reginald Brown filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against T G Werlich. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2331

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

REGINALD BROWN

Greenville, IL 62246

Respondent / Appellee

T.G. WERLICH, Warden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Reginald Brown

Attorney at FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P.O. Box 5000

Greenville, IL 62246

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Robert L. Garrison

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

Nine Executive Drive

Fairview Heights, IL 62208-0000

James M. Cutchin

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

402 W. Main Street

Benton, IL 62812-0000

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER: Appellant Reginald Brown shall have thirty days from the date at the top of this order to file a memorandum explaining why this court should not summarily affirm the district court's judgment. Briefing in this case is otherwise suspended pending further order of the court. MPB [4] [7020073] [19-2331] (FP) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:58 AM]

#5

RESTRICTED

#1

Federal Habeas Corpus Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#6

(#6) 1 copy Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Reginald Brown. Disk not required. [6] [7023910] [19-2331] (CM) [Entered: 08/15/2019 02:36 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed Appellant Reginald Brown jurisdictional memorandum. [7] [7024108] [19-2331] (FP) [Entered: 08/16/2019 01:17 PM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#3

(#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Reginald Brown. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7018690] [19-2331] (CAG) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:40 PM]

#2

C.R. 3(b) Fee Notice

2 #1

D.C. notice denying IFP filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed Appellant Reginald Brown jurisdictional memorandum. [7] [7024108] [19-2331] (FP) [Entered: 08/16/2019 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) 1 copy Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Reginald Brown. Disk not required. [6] [7023910] [19-2331] (CM) [Entered: 08/15/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Prose motion filed by Appellant Reginald Brown to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [5] [7021009] [19-2331] (MM) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Appellant Reginald Brown shall have thirty days from the date at the top of this order to file a memorandum explaining why this court should not summarily affirm the district court's judgment. Briefing in this case is otherwise suspended pending further order of the court. MPB [4] [7020073] [19-2331] (FP) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Reginald Brown. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7018690] [19-2331] (CAG) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Terminated Attorney Robert L. Garrison for T.G. Werlich in 19-2331 and added Attorney James M. Cutchin for party Appellee T.G. Werlich, in case 19-2331 pursuant to email notification from the Office of the U.S. Attorney regarding counsel of record. [7017967-2] [7017967] [19-2331] (JAD) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Reginald Brown leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 07/16/2019. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 08/15/2019 for Appellant Reginald Brown [7017439] [2] [7017439] [19-2331] (VG) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Federal prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Transcript information sheet filed. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Reginald Brown by 07/19/2019.. [1] [7017276] [19-2331] (AP) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.