This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/30/2022 at 06:05:15 (UTC).

Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc v. Novartis Pharma AG

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Novartis Pharma AG. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-427

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Defendant / Appellees

Novartis Pharma AG

Novartis Technology LLC

Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation

Vetter Pharma International GMBH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Adam Banks Esq.

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Anish R. Desai Esq.

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Joshua Halpern Esq.

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

2001 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Elizabeth Weiswasser Esq.

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Eric Shaun Hochstadt

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ian T. Simmons Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

1625 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Benjamin Bradshaw Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

1625 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Melissa Claire Cassel Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

2 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Stephen McIntyre Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Lisa Pensabene Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

George R. McGuire Esq.

1 Lincoln Center, 110 West Fayette Street

Syracuse, NY 13202

Susan E. Farley

Attorney at Heslin Rothenberg Farley & Mesiti P.C.

5 Columbia Circle

Albany, NY 12203

Benjamin T. Horton Esq.

Attorney at Marshall, Gerstein & Borun LLP

6300 Willis Tower, 233 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Julianne Marie Hartzell Esq.

Attorney at Marshall, Gerstein & Borun LLP

6300 Willis Tower, 233 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#59

(#59) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and Novartis Technology LLC, FILED. Service date 04/06/2022 by CM/ECF. [3292497] [22-427] [Entered: 04/06/2022 03:07 PM]

#56

(#56) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/29/2022 by CM/ECF. [3286956] [22-427] [Entered: 03/29/2022 11:06 AM]

#53

(#53) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/29/2022 by CM/ECF. [3286936] [22-427] [Entered: 03/29/2022 10:58 AM]

#52

(#52) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/29/2022 by CM/ECF. [3286927] [22-427] [Entered: 03/29/2022 10:54 AM]

#51

(#51) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/29/2022 by CM/ECF. [3286918] [22-427] [Entered: 03/29/2022 10:50 AM]

#49

No Description Available

#47

No Description Available

#43

No Description Available

#39

No Description Available

37 #2

Supporting Document

37 #1

Motion FILED

35 #2

Supporting Document

35 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

#34

No Description Available

#32

No Description Available

#30

No Description Available

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) ATTORNEY, Lisa Pensabene for Novartis Technology LLC, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, and Novartis Pharma AG, in case 22-427, [ # 59 ], ADDED.[3292588] [22-427] [Entered: 04/06/2022 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and Novartis Technology LLC, FILED. Service date 04/06/2022 by CM/ECF. [3292497] [22-427] [Entered: 04/06/2022 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) ATTORNEY, Joshua Halpern for Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., in case 22-427, [ # 56 ], ADDED.[3286959] [22-427] [Entered: 03/29/2022 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ATTORNEY, Anish R. Desai for Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., in case 22-427, [ # 53 ], ADDED.[3286957] [22-427] [Entered: 03/29/2022 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/29/2022 by CM/ECF. [3286956] [22-427] [Entered: 03/29/2022 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) ATTORNEY, Eric Shaun Hochstadt for Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., in case 22-427, [ # 52 ], ADDED.[3286953] [22-427] [Entered: 03/29/2022 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ATTORNEY, Elizabeth Weiswasser for Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., in case 22-427, [ # 51 ], ADDED.[3286946] [22-427] [Entered: 03/29/2022 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/29/2022 by CM/ECF. [3286936] [22-427] [Entered: 03/29/2022 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/29/2022 by CM/ECF. [3286927] [22-427] [Entered: 03/29/2022 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/29/2022 by CM/ECF. [3286918] [22-427] [Entered: 03/29/2022 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/11/2022 by CM/ECF.[3276749] [22-427] [Entered: 03/11/2022 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/11/2022 by CM/ECF.[3276746] [22-427] [Entered: 03/11/2022 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/10/2022 by CM/ECF.[3275894] [22-427] [Entered: 03/10/2022 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY, Adam Banks for Appellant Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., in case 22-427, [ # 6 ], ADDED.[3275860] [22-427] [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/10/2022 by CM/ECF. [3275550] [22-427] [Entered: 03/10/2022 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3270958] [22-427] [Entered: 03/03/2022 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/31/2022, RECEIVED.[3270956] [22-427] [Entered: 03/03/2022 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/31/2022, RECEIVED.[3270955] [22-427] [Entered: 03/03/2022 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Docket(#2) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., district court receipt # ANYNDC-5817402, FILED.[3270953] [22-427] [Entered: 03/03/2022 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., FILED. [3270943] [22-427] [Entered: 03/03/2022 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Novartis Pharma AG is a litigant

Latest cases where Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sandoz Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Susan E. Farley(Designation Retained)