This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 05:33:56 (UTC).

Red Cliff Band of Lake Superi v. Bayfield County, Wisconsin

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Red Cliff Band of Lake Superi filed an Other lawsuit against Bayfield County, Wisconsin. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1250

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

RED CLIFF BAND OF LAKE SUPERIOR CHIPPEWA INDIANS OF WISCONSIN

Defendant / Appellant

BAYFIELD COUNTY, WISCONSIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

David Ujke

88385 Pike Road

Bayfield, WI 54814

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Danielle Baudhuin Tierney

Attorney at AXLEY BRYNELSON LLP

Two E. Mifflin Street

Madison, WI 53703

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Danielle Baudhuin Tierney for Appellant Bayfield County, Wisconsin. [2] [7062529] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-1250] [Edited 02/14/2020 by CG to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (Tierney, Danielle) [Entered: 02/14/2020 10:51 AM]

#3

(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Colette Routel for Appellee Red Cliff Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians of Wisconsin. [3] [7062707] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1250] (Routel, Colette) [Entered: 02/14/2020 04:03 PM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Colette Routel for Appellee Red Cliff Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians of Wisconsin. [3] [7062707] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1250] (Routel, Colette) [Entered: 02/14/2020 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Danielle Baudhuin Tierney for Appellant Bayfield County, Wisconsin. [2] [7062529] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-1250] [Edited 02/14/2020 by CG to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (Tierney, Danielle) [Entered: 02/14/2020 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 02/27/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/24/2020 for Bayfield County, Wisconsin [1] [7062228] [20-1250] (AP) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.