This case was last updated from PACER on 12/28/2019 at 06:04:12 (UTC).

Rebecca Friske v. Bonnier Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 Rebecca Friske filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Bonnier Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2263

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

WILLIAM LETARTE

Plaintiff / Appellee

REBECCA FRISKE

Defendant / Appellee

BONNIER CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Nick Suciu III

Attorney at Barbat, Mansour & Suciu

6905 Telegraph Road, Suite 115

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48301

Joseph I. Marchese

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

888 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Gary F. Lynch

Attorney at Carlson Lynch

1133 Penn Avenue, Fifth Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15224

Jamisen A. Etzel

Attorney at Carlson Lynch

1133 Penn Avenue, Fifth Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15224

Daniel O. Myers

Attorney at Law Offices

4020 Copper View, Suite 225

Traverse City, MI 49684

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John J. Gillooly

Attorney at Garan Lucow Miller

1155 Brewery Park Boulevard, Suite 200

Detroit, MI 48207

Daniel T. Stabile

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen LLP

200 South Biscayne Boulevard., Suite 4100

Miami, FL 33131

Daniel Tramel Stabile

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen

200 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 4100

Miami, FL 33131

Suzanne Labrit

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen

4301 W. Boy Scout Boulevard, Suite 300

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 01/21/2020; appellee brief due 02/20/2020. (SSS) [Entered: 12/10/2019 02:15 PM]

#17

(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Nick Suciu, III for Appellant William LeTarte Certificate of Service: 11/15/2019. [19-2263] (NS) [Entered: 11/15/2019 02:29 PM]

#16

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Rebecca Friske by Gary F. Lynch. Certificate of Service: 11/01/2019. [19-2263] (GFL) [Entered: 11/01/2019 05:03 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Rebecca Friske by Jamisen A. Etzel. Certificate of Service: 11/01/2019. [19-2263] (JAE) [Entered: 11/01/2019 04:57 PM]

8 #2

letter sent

8 #1

Letter

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Case Opening Letter

#1

Case Opening Letter

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • (#26) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 12/26/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 01/21/2020; appellee brief due 02/20/2020. (SSS) [Entered: 12/10/2019 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • (#24) Transcript, [18], has been filed in the District Court on 12/05/2019 ; Court Reporter: Ms. Rene Lynn Twedt ; Actual Number of Pages: 29 ; Actual Number of Volumes: 1 ; [19-2263] (RLT) [Entered: 12/10/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • (#23) NOTIFICATION: Setting transcript deadline, relating to transcript order, [18] Transcript to be filed in district court by Rene Lynn Twedt by 01/02/2020. (SSS) [Entered: 12/03/2019 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • (#22) Court Reporter Acknowledgement filed by Ms. Rene Lynn Twedt, for transcript [18] ; Arrangements for payment were made on 12/02/2019 ; Estimated completion date: 12/05/2019 ; Estimated number of pages: 30 . [19-2263] (RLT) [Entered: 12/03/2019 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • (#21) Court Reporter Acknowledgement filed by Ms. Rene Lynn Twedt, for transcript [18] ; Arrangements for payment have not been made pursuant to FRAP (10(b)). [19-2263] (RLT) [Entered: 12/02/2019 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • (#20) NOTIFICATION: Setting acknowledgement deadline, relating to transcript order, [18]. Rene Lynn Twedt's acknowledgement is due 12/02/2019. (RB) [Entered: 11/18/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 11/26/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 11/18/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • (#18) TRANSCRIPT ordered from Ms. Rene Lynn Twedt, filed by Mr. Nick Suciu, III for William LeTarte. [18] ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 11/18/2019 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: Judge David M. Lawson ; Hearing Dates: September 23, 2019 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Award ; Method of Payment: Private Funds ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 11/18/2019. [19-2263] (NS) [Entered: 11/18/2019 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Nick Suciu, III for Appellant William LeTarte Certificate of Service: 11/15/2019. [19-2263] (NS) [Entered: 11/15/2019 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Rebecca Friske by Gary F. Lynch. Certificate of Service: 11/01/2019. [19-2263] (GFL) [Entered: 11/01/2019 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Rebecca Friske by Jamisen A. Etzel. Certificate of Service: 11/01/2019. [19-2263] (JAE) [Entered: 11/01/2019 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LETTER SENT to all parties, regarding amended caption. The caption has been amended to correct the appellant party designation on appeal. Appellant William LeTarte has been re-designated as an Objector-Appellant. (SSS) [Entered: 11/01/2019 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) **DEFECTIVE ENTRY**APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Rebecca Friske by Daniel O. Myers. Certificate of Service: 11/01/2019. [19-2263]-Counsel is advised to refile only listing the party on appeal he is representing.--[Edited 11/01/2019 by SSS] (DOM) [Entered: 11/01/2019 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) **DEFECTIVE ENTRY**APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Rebecca Friske by Jamisen A. Etzel. Certificate of Service: 10/31/2019. [19-2263]-Counsel is advised to refile only listing the party on appeal he is representing.--[Edited 11/01/2019 by SSS] (JAE) [Entered: 10/31/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) **DEFECTIVE ENTRY**APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Rebecca Friske by Gary F. Lynch. Certificate of Service: 10/31/2019. [19-2263]-Counsel is advised to refile only listing the party on appeal he is representing.--[Edited 11/01/2019 by SSS] (GFL) [Entered: 10/31/2019 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 11/21/2019 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 10/30/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • (#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 10/30/2019 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 10/29/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant William LeTarte. Transcript needed: y. (SSS) [Entered: 10/29/2019 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bonnier Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph I Marchese