This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/16/2022 at 06:07:20 (UTC).

Rebecca Brogan-Johnson v. Navient Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 Rebecca Brogan-Johnson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Navient Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1291

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

REBECCA L. BROGAN-JOHNSON

Defendant / Appellee

NAVIENT SOLUTIONS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Frank X. Duff Esq. III

Attorney at SCHRADER COMPANION DUFF & LAW, PLLC

401 Main Street

Wheeling, WV 26003-0000

Sandra K. Law

Attorney at SCHRADER COMPANION DUFF & LAW, PLLC

401 Main Street

Wheeling, WV 26003-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jared Tully

Attorney at FROST BROWN TODD

500 Virginia Street, East

Charleston, WV 25301

Mary Claire Davis

Attorney at FROST BROWN TODD

500 Virginia Street, East

Charleston, WV 25301

Alex Jeffrey Zurbuch

Attorney at FROST BROWN TODD

500 Virginia Street, East

Charleston, WV 25301

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00155-JPB. Case manager: ABrownlee. [1001130112] [22-1291] AB [Entered: 03/17/2022 06:43 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00155-JPB. Mailed to: Sandra K. Law and Alex J. Zurbuch. [1001130113] [22-1291] AB [Entered: 03/17/2022 06:45 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Sandra K. Law and Alex J. Zurbuch. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001130114] Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/26/2022. Response Brief due 05/26/2022. [22-1291] AB [Entered: 03/17/2022 06:46 PM]

#4

(#4) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Rebecca L. Brogan-Johnson.. [1001135446] [22-1291] James Companion [Entered: 03/28/2022 02:09 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jared M. Tully for Navient Solutions, Inc.. [1001135451] [22-1291] Alex Zurbuch [Entered: 03/28/2022 02:13 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alex J. Zurbuch for Navient Solutions, Inc.. [1001135453] [22-1291] Alex Zurbuch [Entered: 03/28/2022 02:14 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mary Claire Davis for Navient Solutions, Inc.. [1001135456] [22-1291] Alex Zurbuch [Entered: 03/28/2022 02:15 PM]

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Navient Solutions, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001135472] [22-1291] Alex Zurbuch [Entered: 03/28/2022 02:22 PM]

#9

(#9) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [1001135653] [22-1291] LHP [Entered: 03/28/2022 04:09 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sandra K. Law for Rebecca L. Brogan-Johnson. [1001138413] [22-1291] Sandra Law [Entered: 03/31/2022 04:27 PM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Frank X. Duff for Rebecca L. Brogan-Johnson. [1001138424] [22-1291] Sandra Law [Entered: 03/31/2022 04:31 PM]

#12

(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rebecca L. Brogan-Johnson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001138431] [22-1291] Sandra Law [Entered: 03/31/2022 04:37 PM]

#13

(#13) ORDER filed extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until May 12, 2022. Number of days granted: 16. Opening brief and appendix due 05/12/2022. Response brief due 06/13/2022. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1001140029] [22-1291] TW [Entered: 04/04/2022 02:27 PM]

#14

(#14) BRIEF by Rebecca L. Brogan-Johnson. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1001161647] [22-1291] Sandra Law [Entered: 05/12/2022 03:27 PM]

15 #1

JOINT APPENDIX - Volume One

15 #2

JOINT APPENDIX - Volume Two

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) JOINT APPENDIX by Rebecca L. Brogan-Johnson. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1001161665] [22-1291] Sandra Law [Entered: 05/12/2022 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BRIEF by Rebecca L. Brogan-Johnson. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1001161647] [22-1291] Sandra Law [Entered: 05/12/2022 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER filed extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until May 12, 2022. Number of days granted: 16. Opening brief and appendix due 05/12/2022. Response brief due 06/13/2022. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1001140029] [22-1291] TW [Entered: 04/04/2022 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rebecca L. Brogan-Johnson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001138431] [22-1291] Sandra Law [Entered: 03/31/2022 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Frank X. Duff for Rebecca L. Brogan-Johnson. [1001138424] [22-1291] Sandra Law [Entered: 03/31/2022 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sandra K. Law for Rebecca L. Brogan-Johnson. [1001138413] [22-1291] Sandra Law [Entered: 03/31/2022 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [1001135653] [22-1291] LHP [Entered: 03/28/2022 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Navient Solutions, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001135472] [22-1291] Alex Zurbuch [Entered: 03/28/2022 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mary Claire Davis for Navient Solutions, Inc.. [1001135456] [22-1291] Alex Zurbuch [Entered: 03/28/2022 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alex J. Zurbuch for Navient Solutions, Inc.. [1001135453] [22-1291] Alex Zurbuch [Entered: 03/28/2022 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jared M. Tully for Navient Solutions, Inc.. [1001135451] [22-1291] Alex Zurbuch [Entered: 03/28/2022 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Rebecca L. Brogan-Johnson.. [1001135446] [22-1291] James Companion [Entered: 03/28/2022 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Sandra K. Law and Alex J. Zurbuch. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001130114] Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/26/2022. Response Brief due 05/26/2022. [22-1291] AB [Entered: 03/17/2022 06:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00155-JPB. Mailed to: Sandra K. Law and Alex J. Zurbuch. [1001130113] [22-1291] AB [Entered: 03/17/2022 06:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00155-JPB. Case manager: ABrownlee. [1001130112] [22-1291] AB [Entered: 03/17/2022 06:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Navient Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex J. Zurbuch