This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2019 at 06:05:33 (UTC).

Realtime Data LLC v. Fortinet, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2019 Realtime Data LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Fortinet, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2204

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

REALTIME DATA LLC, dba IXO

Defendant / Appellee

FORTINET, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Stephen Brauerman Esq.

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 900, Po Box 25130

Wilmington, DE 19899

Marc Aaron Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, Po Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

John Neukom

Attorney at Skadden Arps

525 University Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94301

James Y. Pak

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

525 University Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94301

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Realtime Data LLC. Service: 08/13/2019 by email. [628054] [19-2204] [Marc Fenster] [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:05 PM]

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Realtime Data LLC. Service: 08/13/2019 by email. [628053] [19-2204] [Marc Fenster] [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:04 PM]

#6

(#6) Entry of appearance for MARC A. FENSTER as principal counsel for Appellant Realtime Data LLC. Service: 08/13/2019 by email. [628052] [19-2204] [Marc Fenster] [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:04 PM]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for James Y. Pak as of counsel for Appellee Fortinet, Inc.. Service: 08/13/2019 by email. [628047] [19-2204] [James Pak] [Entered: 08/13/2019 09:41 PM]

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Fortinet, Inc.. Service: 08/13/2019 by email. [628046] [19-2204] [John Neukom] [Entered: 08/13/2019 09:33 PM]

#3

(#3) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Fortinet, Inc.. Service: 08/13/2019 by email. [628045] [19-2204] [John Neukom] [Entered: 08/13/2019 09:30 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for John M. Neukom as principal counsel for Appellee Fortinet, Inc.. Service: 08/13/2019 by email. [628044] [19-2204] [John Neukom] [Entered: 08/13/2019 09:26 PM]

#4

(#10) ORDER consolidating appeals 19-2198, 19-2201, 19-2202, and 19-2204. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. The appellant's opening brief is due no later than 09/30/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [630579] [19-2198, 19-2201, 19-2202, 19-2204] [JAL] [Entered: 08/23/2019 10:46 AM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • (#11) Note to file: The following cases are associated: 19-2198 Lead with 19-2201, 19-2202, and 19-2204 Member Cases. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. Entries of Appearance, Certificates of Interest, and Docketing Statements for all parties are due 09/06/2019. [630584] [19-2198, 19-2201, 19-2202, 19-2204] [JAL] [Entered: 08/23/2019 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER consolidating appeals 19-2198, 19-2201, 19-2202, and 19-2204. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. The appellant's opening brief is due no later than 09/30/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [630579] [19-2198, 19-2201, 19-2202, 19-2204] [JAL] [Entered: 08/23/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 6 ], certificate of interest Docket No. [ # 7 ], docketing statement Docket No. [ # 8 ], ERROR: The entry of appearance and the certificates of service attached to the docketing statement and certificate of interest were submitted in an editable format. CORRECTION: All submissions with the court must be flattened. Please ensure future filings are not in an editable format. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [628201] [CAB] [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Realtime Data LLC. Service: 08/13/2019 by email. [628054] [19-2204] [Marc Fenster] [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Realtime Data LLC. Service: 08/13/2019 by email. [628053] [19-2204] [Marc Fenster] [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Entry of appearance for MARC A. FENSTER as principal counsel for Appellant Realtime Data LLC. Service: 08/13/2019 by email. [628052] [19-2204] [Marc Fenster] [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Entry of appearance for James Y. Pak as of counsel for Appellee Fortinet, Inc.. Service: 08/13/2019 by email. [628047] [19-2204] [James Pak] [Entered: 08/13/2019 09:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Fortinet, Inc.. Service: 08/13/2019 by email. [628046] [19-2204] [John Neukom] [Entered: 08/13/2019 09:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Fortinet, Inc.. Service: 08/13/2019 by email. [628045] [19-2204] [John Neukom] [Entered: 08/13/2019 09:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for John M. Neukom as principal counsel for Appellee Fortinet, Inc.. Service: 08/13/2019 by email. [628044] [19-2204] [John Neukom] [Entered: 08/13/2019 09:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/30/2019. [624540] Entry of Appearance is due 08/13/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/13/2019. Docketing Statement is due 08/13/2019. Appellant's brief is due 09/30/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fortinet, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Realtime Data LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Neukom