This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/15/2023 at 20:48:23 (UTC).

Realtime Data LLC v. Array Networks Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 Realtime Data LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Array Networks Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2251

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendants

ARRAY NETWORKS INC.

NIMBUS DATA, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

REALTIME DATA LLC, dba IXO

Defendant / Appellees

FORTINET, INC.

REDUXIO SYSTEMS, INC.

PANZURA, INC.

QUEST SOFTWARE, INC.

CTERA NETWORKS, LTD.

ARYAKA NETWORKS, INC.

OPEN TEXT, INC.

MONGODB INC.

EGNYTE, INC.

SPECTRA LOGIC CORPORATION

Amicus Curiae

VERITAS TECHNOLOGIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Marc A. Fenster

Paul Anthony Kroeger

Brian David Ledahl

Shani M. Williams

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John Neukom

Douglas R. Nemec

James Y. Pak

Guy Yonay

Theodore J. Angelis

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#93

(#93) Response to notice of oral argument from Appellee Fortinet, Inc.. Service: 12/30/2022 by email. [894007] [21-2251] [John Neukom] [Entered: 12/30/2022 08:07 PM]

#92

(#92) Response to notice of oral argument from Appellant Realtime Data LLC. Service: 12/30/2022 by email. [893859] [21-2251] [Brian Ledahl] [Entered: 12/30/2022 12:17 PM]

#91

(#91) Response to notice of oral argument from Appellee Panzura, Inc.. Service: 12/29/2022 by email. [893708] [21-2251] [Mahsa Rohani] [Entered: 12/29/2022 05:09 PM]

#90

(#90) Response to notice of oral argument from Appellee Egnyte, Inc.. Service: 12/23/2022 by email. [892710] [21-2251] [Ryan Beard] [Entered: 12/23/2022 02:21 PM]

#89

(#89) NOTICE OF ORAL ARGUMENT. Panel: 2302K. Case scheduled February 10, 2023. Response to Notice of Oral Argument due: 12/30/2022. Please review the attached Notice. The response to notice of oral argument form can be found # here . The Oral Argument Guide can be found # here . Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [891209] [JCP] [Entered: 12/16/2022 03:08 PM]

#87

(#87) Notice from Appellee Fortinet, Inc. regarding conflicts with oral argument. Service: 11/16/2022 by email. [884560] [21-2251] [John Neukom] [Entered: 11/16/2022 04:54 PM]

#85

(#85) Notice from Appellant Realtime Data LLC regarding conflicts with oral argument. Service: 11/15/2022 by email. [884197] [21-2251] [Brian Ledahl] [Entered: 11/15/2022 03:18 PM]

#9

#8

#7

6 #2

Attachment to the Certificate of Interest

6 #1

Certificate of Interest

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • Docket(#94) Submitted after ORAL ARGUMENT to Panel: Newman, Circuit Judge; Reyna, Circuit Judge and Taranto, Circuit Judge. Arguing counsel: Brian David Ledahl for Realtime Data LLC and Mr. John Neukom for Fortinet, Inc.. Oral Argument Audio available # here . [903564] [MVH] [Entered: 02/10/2023 03:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) Response to notice of oral argument from Appellee Fortinet, Inc.. Service: 12/30/2022 by email. [894007] [21-2251] [John Neukom] [Entered: 12/30/2022 08:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) Response to notice of oral argument from Appellant Realtime Data LLC. Service: 12/30/2022 by email. [893859] [21-2251] [Brian Ledahl] [Entered: 12/30/2022 12:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) Response to notice of oral argument from Appellee Panzura, Inc.. Service: 12/29/2022 by email. [893708] [21-2251] [Mahsa Rohani] [Entered: 12/29/2022 05:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) Response to notice of oral argument from Appellee Egnyte, Inc.. Service: 12/23/2022 by email. [892710] [21-2251] [Ryan Beard] [Entered: 12/23/2022 02:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) NOTICE OF ORAL ARGUMENT. Panel: 2302K. Case scheduled February 10, 2023. Response to Notice of Oral Argument due: 12/30/2022. Please review the attached Notice. The response to notice of oral argument form can be found # here . The Oral Argument Guide can be found # here . Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [891209] [JCP] [Entered: 12/16/2022 03:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • Docket(#88) The following conflict dates submitted by John Neukom for Fortinet, Inc. have been accepted by the court: 07/03/2023, 07/05/2023, 07/06/2023, 07/07/2023. [884598] [MJL] [Entered: 11/17/2022 08:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) Notice from Appellee Fortinet, Inc. regarding conflicts with oral argument. Service: 11/16/2022 by email. [884560] [21-2251] [John Neukom] [Entered: 11/16/2022 04:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • Docket(#86) The following conflict dates submitted by Brian David Ledahl for Realtime Data LLC have been accepted by the court: 01/09/2023, 01/10/2023, 01/11/2023, 02/07/2023, 04/03/2023, 04/04/2023, 04/05/2023, 04/06/2023, 04/07/2023, 06/09/2023. [884523] [MJL] [Entered: 11/16/2022 03:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Notice from Appellant Realtime Data LLC regarding conflicts with oral argument. Service: 11/15/2022 by email. [884197] [21-2251] [Brian Ledahl] [Entered: 11/15/2022 03:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Aryaka Networks, Inc.. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798119] [21-2251] [Joshua Masur] [Entered: 09/09/2021 04:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Aryaka Networks, Inc.. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798114] [21-2251] [Joshua Masur] [Entered: 09/09/2021 04:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for Joshua M. Masur as counsel for Appellee Aryaka Networks, Inc.. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798111] [21-2251] [Joshua Masur] [Entered: 09/09/2021 04:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Realtime Data LLC. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798110] [21-2251] [Reza Mirzaie] [Entered: 09/09/2021 04:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Realtime Data LLC. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798109] [21-2251] [Reza Mirzaie] [Entered: 09/09/2021 04:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Reza Mirzaie; Marc A. Fenster; Brian D. Ledahl; Paul A. Kroeger; Shani Williams as counsel for Appellant Realtime Data LLC. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798107] [21-2251] [Reza Mirzaie] [Entered: 09/09/2021 03:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellee MongoDB Inc.. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798100] [21-2251] [Hilary Preston] [Entered: 09/09/2021 03:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellee MongoDB Inc.. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798099] [21-2251] [Hilary Preston] [Entered: 09/09/2021 03:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Hilary L. Preston as counsel for Appellee MongoDB Inc.. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798098] [21-2251] [Hilary Preston] [Entered: 09/09/2021 03:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 08/26/2021. [795474] Entry of Appearance is due on 09/09/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/09/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 09/09/2021. Appellant's brief is due on 10/25/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 08/26/2021 12:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less