21-2251
08/26/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Patent
ARRAY NETWORKS INC.
NIMBUS DATA, INC.
REALTIME DATA LLC, dba IXO
FORTINET, INC.
REDUXIO SYSTEMS, INC.
PANZURA, INC.
QUEST SOFTWARE, INC.
CTERA NETWORKS, LTD.
ARYAKA NETWORKS, INC.
OPEN TEXT, INC.
MONGODB INC.
EGNYTE, INC.
SPECTRA LOGIC CORPORATION
VERITAS TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Reza Mirzaie
Attorney at Russ August & Kabat
12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200
Los Angeles, CA 90025
Marc A. Fenster
Attorney at Russ August & Kabat
12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200
Los Angeles, CA 90025
Paul Anthony Kroeger
Attorney at Russ August & Kabat
12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200
Los Angeles, CA 90025
Brian David Ledahl
Attorney at Russ August & Kabat
12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200
Los Angeles, CA 90025
Shani M. Williams
Attorney at Russ August & Kabat
12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200
Los Angeles, CA 90025
John Neukom
Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
650 California Street
San Francisco, CA 94108
Douglas R. Nemec
Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
One Manhattan West
New York, NY 10001-8602
James Y. Pak
Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
525 University Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94301
Guy Yonay
Attorney at Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz LLP
7 Times Square, 19Th Floor
New York, NY 10036
Theodore J. Angelis
Attorney at K&L Gates LLP
925 Fourth Avenue
Seattle, WA 98104
(#93) Response to notice of oral argument from Appellee Fortinet, Inc.. Service: 12/30/2022 by email. [894007] [21-2251] [John Neukom] [Entered: 12/30/2022 08:07 PM]
(#92) Response to notice of oral argument from Appellant Realtime Data LLC. Service: 12/30/2022 by email. [893859] [21-2251] [Brian Ledahl] [Entered: 12/30/2022 12:17 PM]
(#91) Response to notice of oral argument from Appellee Panzura, Inc.. Service: 12/29/2022 by email. [893708] [21-2251] [Mahsa Rohani] [Entered: 12/29/2022 05:09 PM]
(#90) Response to notice of oral argument from Appellee Egnyte, Inc.. Service: 12/23/2022 by email. [892710] [21-2251] [Ryan Beard] [Entered: 12/23/2022 02:21 PM]
(#89) NOTICE OF ORAL ARGUMENT. Panel: 2302K. Case scheduled February 10, 2023. Response to Notice of Oral Argument due: 12/30/2022. Please review the attached Notice. The response to notice of oral argument form can be found # here . The Oral Argument Guide can be found # here . Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [891209] [JCP] [Entered: 12/16/2022 03:08 PM]
(#87) Notice from Appellee Fortinet, Inc. regarding conflicts with oral argument. Service: 11/16/2022 by email. [884560] [21-2251] [John Neukom] [Entered: 11/16/2022 04:54 PM]
(#85) Notice from Appellant Realtime Data LLC regarding conflicts with oral argument. Service: 11/15/2022 by email. [884197] [21-2251] [Brian Ledahl] [Entered: 11/15/2022 03:18 PM]
Attachment to the Certificate of Interest
Certificate of Interest
Civil Case Docketed
Notice of Docketing
Docket(#94) Submitted after ORAL ARGUMENT to Panel: Newman, Circuit Judge; Reyna, Circuit Judge and Taranto, Circuit Judge. Arguing counsel: Brian David Ledahl for Realtime Data LLC and Mr. John Neukom for Fortinet, Inc.. Oral Argument Audio available # here . [903564] [MVH] [Entered: 02/10/2023 03:40 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#93) Response to notice of oral argument from Appellee Fortinet, Inc.. Service: 12/30/2022 by email. [894007] [21-2251] [John Neukom] [Entered: 12/30/2022 08:07 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#92) Response to notice of oral argument from Appellant Realtime Data LLC. Service: 12/30/2022 by email. [893859] [21-2251] [Brian Ledahl] [Entered: 12/30/2022 12:17 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#91) Response to notice of oral argument from Appellee Panzura, Inc.. Service: 12/29/2022 by email. [893708] [21-2251] [Mahsa Rohani] [Entered: 12/29/2022 05:09 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#90) Response to notice of oral argument from Appellee Egnyte, Inc.. Service: 12/23/2022 by email. [892710] [21-2251] [Ryan Beard] [Entered: 12/23/2022 02:21 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#89) NOTICE OF ORAL ARGUMENT. Panel: 2302K. Case scheduled February 10, 2023. Response to Notice of Oral Argument due: 12/30/2022. Please review the attached Notice. The response to notice of oral argument form can be found # here . The Oral Argument Guide can be found # here . Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [891209] [JCP] [Entered: 12/16/2022 03:08 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#88) The following conflict dates submitted by John Neukom for Fortinet, Inc. have been accepted by the court: 07/03/2023, 07/05/2023, 07/06/2023, 07/07/2023. [884598] [MJL] [Entered: 11/17/2022 08:43 AM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#87) Notice from Appellee Fortinet, Inc. regarding conflicts with oral argument. Service: 11/16/2022 by email. [884560] [21-2251] [John Neukom] [Entered: 11/16/2022 04:54 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#86) The following conflict dates submitted by Brian David Ledahl for Realtime Data LLC have been accepted by the court: 01/09/2023, 01/10/2023, 01/11/2023, 02/07/2023, 04/03/2023, 04/04/2023, 04/05/2023, 04/06/2023, 04/07/2023, 06/09/2023. [884523] [MJL] [Entered: 11/16/2022 03:47 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#85) Notice from Appellant Realtime Data LLC regarding conflicts with oral argument. Service: 11/15/2022 by email. [884197] [21-2251] [Brian Ledahl] [Entered: 11/15/2022 03:18 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Aryaka Networks, Inc.. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798119] [21-2251] [Joshua Masur] [Entered: 09/09/2021 04:10 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Aryaka Networks, Inc.. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798114] [21-2251] [Joshua Masur] [Entered: 09/09/2021 04:08 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) Entry of appearance for Joshua M. Masur as counsel for Appellee Aryaka Networks, Inc.. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798111] [21-2251] [Joshua Masur] [Entered: 09/09/2021 04:05 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Realtime Data LLC. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798110] [21-2251] [Reza Mirzaie] [Entered: 09/09/2021 04:02 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Realtime Data LLC. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798109] [21-2251] [Reza Mirzaie] [Entered: 09/09/2021 04:01 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) Entry of appearance for Reza Mirzaie; Marc A. Fenster; Brian D. Ledahl; Paul A. Kroeger; Shani Williams as counsel for Appellant Realtime Data LLC. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798107] [21-2251] [Reza Mirzaie] [Entered: 09/09/2021 03:58 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellee MongoDB Inc.. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798100] [21-2251] [Hilary Preston] [Entered: 09/09/2021 03:41 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellee MongoDB Inc.. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798099] [21-2251] [Hilary Preston] [Entered: 09/09/2021 03:39 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Entry of appearance for Hilary L. Preston as counsel for Appellee MongoDB Inc.. Service: 09/09/2021 by email. [798098] [21-2251] [Hilary Preston] [Entered: 09/09/2021 03:37 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 08/26/2021. [795474] Entry of Appearance is due on 09/09/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/09/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 09/09/2021. Appellant's brief is due on 10/25/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 08/26/2021 12:57 PM]
[-] Read Less