This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/09/2021 at 06:15:27 (UTC).

Realtime Adaptive Streaming v. Netflix, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 Realtime Adaptive Streaming filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Netflix, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1518

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

REALTIME ADAPTIVE STREAMING LLC

Defendant / Appellants

NETFLIX, INC.

NETFLIX STREAMING SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Todd Richard Gregorian

Attorney at Fenwick & West, LLP

801 California Street, Silicon Valley Center

Mountain View, CA 94041

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • Docket(#4) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-1484 Lead with 21-1485 Consolidated Member Case and 21-1518 and 21-1519 Cross-Appeals. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [749042] [21-1484, 21-1485, 21-1518, 21-1519] [EKD] [Entered: 01/13/2021 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER consolidating appeals 21-1484, 21-1485, 21-1518, and 21-1519. Appellant's opening brief is due no later than March 5, 2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [749041] [21-1484, 21-1485, 21-1518, 21-1519] [EKD] [Entered: 01/13/2021 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docket(#2) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-1484 Lead with 21-1518 Cross-Appeal. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [748118] [21-1484, 21-1518] [EKD] [Entered: 01/08/2021 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/05/2021. [748117] . [EKD] [Entered: 01/08/2021 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REALTIME ADAPTIVE STREAMING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Netflix Streaming Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NETFLIX INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Richard Gregorian