This case was last updated from PACER on 09/02/2021 at 05:20:40 (UTC).

Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC v. Sling TV, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Realtime Adaptive Streaming LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sling TV, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2268

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

REALTIME ADAPTIVE STREAMING LLC

Defendant / Appellees

SLING TV, L.L.C.

SLING MEDIA, INC.

SLING MEDIA, L.L.C.

ECHOSTAR TECHNOLOGIES LLC

DISH NETWORK L.L.C.

DISH TECHNOLOGIES L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Philip Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Adam Shartzer

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

1000 Maine Avenue Sw

Washington, DC 20024

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 08/26/2021. [796222] Entry of Appearance is due on 09/14/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/14/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 09/14/2021. Appellant's brief is due on 11/01/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 08/31/2021 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISH Technologies L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sling Media, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sling TV L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Echostar Technologies Holding Corporation is a litigant