This case was last updated from PACER on 07/27/2019 at 06:04:11 (UTC).

Raytheon Company v. Cray Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 Raytheon Company filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cray Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1929

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

CRAY INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

RAYTHEON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David Keith Tellekson

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

1191 Second Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101

Christopher Larson

Attorney at Fenwick & West, LLP

555 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Elizabeth B. Hagan

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

1191 Second Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101

Melanie Lyne Mayer

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

1191 Second Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101

Jonathan Thomas McMichael

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

1191 Second Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101

Bryan Alexander Kohm

Attorney at Fenwick & West, LLP

555 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

John C. Scheller

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich, LLP

One South Pinckney Street, Suite 700, Po Box 1806

Madison, WI 53701

Hannah Lauren Bedard

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Sean M. McEldowney

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Ryan Kane

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Gregg Locascio

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) MOTION of Appellant Raytheon Company to extend the time to 09/27/2019 to file the Opening Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/22/2019 by email. [622435] [19-1929] [Gregg Locascio] [Entered: 07/22/2019 10:51 AM]

#20

(#20) Notice of Correction to the motion to extend time to file brief Doc No. [ # 19 ] for Appellant Raytheon Company. Service: 07/22/2019 by email. [622434] [19-1929] [Gregg Locascio] [Entered: 07/22/2019 10:46 AM]

#19

(#19) MOTION of Appellant Raytheon Company to extend the time to 09/27/2019 to file the Opening brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/18/2019 by email. [622086] [19-1929] [John O'Quinn] [Entered: 07/18/2019 07:17 PM]

#16

(#16) Entry of appearance for Christopher L. Larson as of counsel for Appellee Cray Inc.. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613297] [19-1929] [Christopher Larson] [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:43 PM]

#15

(#15) Entry of appearance for Elizabeth B. Hagan as of counsel for Appellee Cray Inc.. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613292] [19-1929] [Elizabeth Hagan] [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:40 PM]

#14

(#14) Entry of appearance for Jonathan T. McMichael as of counsel for Appellee Cray Inc.. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613291] [19-1929] [Jonathan McMichael] [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:38 PM]

#13

(#13) Entry of appearance for Melanie L. Mayer as of counsel for Appellee Cray Inc.. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613290] [19-1929] [Melanie Mayer] [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:37 PM]

#12

(#17) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 16 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 15 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 14 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 13 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 12 ], docketing statement Docket No. [ # 11 ], certificate of interest Docket No. [ # 10 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 9 ], ERROR: The preliminary documents for Cray Inc. contained non-compliant electronic signatures. CORRECTION: For future filings, pursuant to FCR 25(d), all signatures must follow the format of "/s/" followed by the attorney's name. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [613298] [JAL] [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:44 PM]

#11

(#17) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 16 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 15 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 14 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 13 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 12 ], docketing statement Docket No. [ # 11 ], certificate of interest Docket No. [ # 10 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 9 ], ERROR: The preliminary documents for Cray Inc. contained non-compliant electronic signatures. CORRECTION: For future filings, pursuant to FCR 25(d), all signatures must follow the format of "/s/" followed by the attorney's name. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [613298] [JAL] [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:44 PM]

#9

(#17) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 16 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 15 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 14 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 13 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 12 ], docketing statement Docket No. [ # 11 ], certificate of interest Docket No. [ # 10 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 9 ], ERROR: The preliminary documents for Cray Inc. contained non-compliant electronic signatures. CORRECTION: For future filings, pursuant to FCR 25(d), all signatures must follow the format of "/s/" followed by the attorney's name. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [613298] [JAL] [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:44 PM]

#7

(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Raytheon Company. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613196] [19-1929] [Gregg Locascio] [Entered: 06/11/2019 03:02 PM]

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Raytheon Company. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613194] [19-1929] [Gregg Locascio] [Entered: 06/11/2019 03:01 PM]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Hannah L. Bedard as of counsel for Appellant Raytheon Company. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613190] [19-1929] [Gregg Locascio] [Entered: 06/11/2019 03:00 PM]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for Ryan Kane as of counsel for Appellant Raytheon Company. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613187] [19-1929] [Gregg Locascio] [Entered: 06/11/2019 02:58 PM]

#3

(#8) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 3 ], ERROR: The contact information listed on the entry of appearance for S. McEldowney [ # 3 ] does not match the information in the attorney's user account. CORRECTION: Please update as needed to ensure that all information matches. [613207] [JAL] [Entered: 06/11/2019 03:11 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Gregg F. LoCascio, P.C. as principal counsel for Appellant Raytheon Company. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613176] [19-1929] [Gregg Locascio] [Entered: 06/11/2019 02:51 PM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 21 ] filed by Appellant Raytheon Company. Appellant's opening brief is due 09/27/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [622802] [JAL] [Entered: 07/23/2019 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION of Appellant Raytheon Company to extend the time to 09/27/2019 to file the Opening Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/22/2019 by email. [622435] [19-1929] [Gregg Locascio] [Entered: 07/22/2019 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Notice of Correction to the motion to extend time to file brief Doc No. [ # 19 ] for Appellant Raytheon Company. Service: 07/22/2019 by email. [622434] [19-1929] [Gregg Locascio] [Entered: 07/22/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION of Appellant Raytheon Company to extend the time to 09/27/2019 to file the Opening brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/18/2019 by email. [622086] [19-1929] [John O'Quinn] [Entered: 07/18/2019 07:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • (#18) REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a) and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [619740] [JAL] [Entered: 07/09/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 16 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 15 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 14 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 13 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 12 ], docketing statement Docket No. [ # 11 ], certificate of interest Docket No. [ # 10 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 9 ], ERROR: The preliminary documents for Cray Inc. contained non-compliant electronic signatures. CORRECTION: For future filings, pursuant to FCR 25(d), all signatures must follow the format of "/s/" followed by the attorney's name. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [613298] [JAL] [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Entry of appearance for Christopher L. Larson as of counsel for Appellee Cray Inc.. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613297] [19-1929] [Christopher Larson] [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Entry of appearance for Elizabeth B. Hagan as of counsel for Appellee Cray Inc.. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613292] [19-1929] [Elizabeth Hagan] [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Entry of appearance for Jonathan T. McMichael as of counsel for Appellee Cray Inc.. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613291] [19-1929] [Jonathan McMichael] [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Entry of appearance for Melanie L. Mayer as of counsel for Appellee Cray Inc.. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613290] [19-1929] [Melanie Mayer] [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Cray Inc.. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613285] [19-1929] [David Tellekson] [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Entry of appearance for David K. Tellekson as principal counsel for Appellee Cray Inc.. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613283] [19-1929] [David Tellekson] [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 3 ], ERROR: The contact information listed on the entry of appearance for S. McEldowney [ # 3 ] does not match the information in the attorney's user account. CORRECTION: Please update as needed to ensure that all information matches. [613207] [JAL] [Entered: 06/11/2019 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Raytheon Company. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613196] [19-1929] [Gregg Locascio] [Entered: 06/11/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Raytheon Company. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613194] [19-1929] [Gregg Locascio] [Entered: 06/11/2019 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Entry of appearance for Hannah L. Bedard as of counsel for Appellant Raytheon Company. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613190] [19-1929] [Gregg Locascio] [Entered: 06/11/2019 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Entry of appearance for Ryan Kane as of counsel for Appellant Raytheon Company. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613187] [19-1929] [Gregg Locascio] [Entered: 06/11/2019 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Sean M. McEldowney as of counsel for Appellant Raytheon Company. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613183] [19-1929] [Gregg Locascio] [Entered: 06/11/2019 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Gregg F. LoCascio, P.C. as principal counsel for Appellant Raytheon Company. Service: 06/11/2019 by email. [613176] [19-1929] [Gregg Locascio] [Entered: 06/11/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 05/24/2019. [609832] Entry of Appearance is due 06/11/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/11/2019. Docketing Statement is due 06/11/2019. Appellant's brief is due 07/29/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 05/28/2019 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less