This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:04:38 (UTC).

Raymond Whitall v. Stephanie Phan, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Raymond Whitall filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Stephanie Phan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16397

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

A. NEWTON

N. WALKER

ROGER L. MARTINEZ

LIZ DOEHRING

KATHLEEN ALLISON, Warden

MS. DOWLESS

W. L. MUNIZ

GONZALEZ

DR. WILSON

Defendant / Appellees

ELAINE CANTU

STEPHANIE TRAN PHAN, M.D., Primary Care Physician, CDCR

LAWRENCE GAMBOA, M.D., Chief Physician and Surgeon, Salinas Valley State Prison

B. BRIZENDINE, Psy. D., MBA, CCHP, Chief Executive Officer, Salinas Valley State Prison

LAW SAN FU, M.D., Physician and Surgeon, Salinas Valley State Prison

KIM KUMAR

J. LEWIS, Deputy Director, Policy and Risk Management Services

Plaintiff / Appellant

RAYMOND RICHARD WHITALL

Soledad, CA 93960-1050

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Chad Allen Stegeman Esquire

Attorney at California Department of Justice

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Jaime Ganson

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Raymond Richard Whitall

Attorney at SVSP - SALINAS VALLEY STATE PRISON

P.O. Box 1050

Soledad, CA 93960-1050

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Filed original and 7 copies of Appellant Raymond Richard Whitall (Informal: Yes) opening brief of 22 pages. Served on 08/28/2019. [11420263] (KWG) [Entered: 09/04/2019 10:45 AM]

1 #2

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

4 #2

Prisoner Fee Authorization

#3

(#3) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 07/24/2019. [11382356] (NAC) [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:24 AM]

4 #1

Main Document

#2

(#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11366234] (CKP) [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:49 AM]

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed original and 7 copies of Appellant Raymond Richard Whitall (Informal: Yes) opening brief of 22 pages. Served on 08/28/2019. [11420263] (KWG) [Entered: 09/04/2019 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • (#6) Attorney Chad Allen Stegeman in 19-16397 substituted by Attorney Jaime Ganson in 19-16397 [11410348] (NAC) [Entered: 08/26/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jaime M. Ganson (Office of the Attorney General, 1300 I Street, Suite125, Sacramento, CA 95814) for Appellees J. Lewis, Kim Kumar, Elaine Cantu, Stephanie Tran Phan, Lawrence Gamboa, B. Brizendine and Law San Fu. Substitution for Attorney Chad Allen Stegeman, Esquire for Appellees B. Brizendine, Elaine Cantu, Lawrence Gamboa, Kim Kumar, J. Lewis, Stephanie Tran Phan and Law San Fu. Date of service: 08/26/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11410194] [19-16397] (Ganson, Jaime) [Entered: 08/26/2019 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [11386928] (CKP) [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 07/24/2019. [11382356] (NAC) [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11366234] (CKP) [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Raymond Richard Whitall opening brief due 09/10/2019. Appellees B. Brizendine, Elaine Cantu, Lawrence Gamboa, Kim Kumar, J. Lewis, Stephanie Tran Phan and Law San Fu answering brief due 10/10/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11364585] (JPD) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.