This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2021 at 06:14:15 (UTC).

Raymond Devore v. BOP, et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 Raymond Devore filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against BOP. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35820

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

RAYMOND EARL DEVORE

Sheridan, OR 97378-5000

Defendant / Appellees

FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS

SELECT OFFICIALS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Raymond Earl Devore

Attorney at FCI - FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION - SHERIDAN

P.O. Box 5000

Sheridan, OR 97378-5000

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed Appellant Raymond Earl Devore motion to appoint pro bono counsel. Deficiencies: None. [12254730] (RR) [Entered: 10/12/2021 04:50 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed Appellant Raymond Earl Devore letter dated 10/04/2021 re: verification appeal will continue IFP.. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12254736] (RR) [Entered: 10/12/2021 04:52 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed order (M. MARGARET MCKEOWN, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and JAY S. BYBEE): A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the orders challenged in the appeal are not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; In re San Vicente Med. Partners Ltd., 865 F.2d 1128, 1131 (9th Cir. 1989) (order) (magistrate judge order not final or appealable); Wilborn v. Escalderon, 789 F.2d 1328, 1330 (9th Cir. 1986) (denial of appointment of counsel in civil case is not appealable); see also Branson v. City of Los Angeles, 912 F.2d 334 (9th Cir. 1990) (denial of reconsideration of non-appealable order is itself not appealable). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. All pending motions are denied as moot. DISMISSED. [12259780] (AF) [Entered: 10/18/2021 11:34 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed order (M. MARGARET MCKEOWN, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and JAY S. BYBEE): A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the orders challenged in the appeal are not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; In re San Vicente Med. Partners Ltd., 865 F.2d 1128, 1131 (9th Cir. 1989) (order) (magistrate judge order not final or appealable); Wilborn v. Escalderon, 789 F.2d 1328, 1330 (9th Cir. 1986) (denial of appointment of counsel in civil case is not appealable); see also Branson v. City of Los Angeles, 912 F.2d 334 (9th Cir. 1990) (denial of reconsideration of non-appealable order is itself not appealable). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. All pending motions are denied as moot. DISMISSED. [12259780] (AF) [Entered: 10/18/2021 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Appellant Raymond Earl Devore letter dated 10/04/2021 re: verification appeal will continue IFP.. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12254736] (RR) [Entered: 10/12/2021 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Appellant Raymond Earl Devore motion to appoint pro bono counsel. Deficiencies: None. [12254730] (RR) [Entered: 10/12/2021 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Raymond Earl Devore opening brief due 11/29/2021. [12243529] (JPD) [Entered: 09/30/2021 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Bureau of Prisons is a litigant