This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2020 at 06:07:19 (UTC).

Raymond A. Semente D.C., P.C. v. Empire Healthchoice Assurance

Case Summary

On 04/09/2020 Raymond A Semente D C , P C filed an Other lawsuit against Empire Healthchoice Assurance. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1201

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Counter Claimants

The Employee Medical Health Plan of Suffolk County

Suffolk County Labor/Management Committee

County of Suffolk

Defendant / Appellees

Verizon Advanced Data Inc.

Verizon Avenue Corp.

Verizon New England Inc.

Verizon Services Corp.

Verizon New York Inc.

Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., DBA Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield

Empire City Subway Company (Limited)

Verizon Corporate Services Corp.

Verizon Communications Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellant

Raymond A. Semente D.C., P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Counter Claimant Attorneys

John Richard Petrowski Esq.

Attorney at Brody, O'Connor & O'Connor, Esqs.

7 Bayview Avenue

Northport, NY 11768

Robert A. Scher Esq.

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

90 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Glenn Green

Attorney at Suffolk County District Attorney's Office

Arthur M. Cromarty Court Complex, 200 Center Drive

Riverhead, NY 11901

Hope Senzer Gabor Esq.

Attorney at Suffolk County Department of Law

H. Lee Dennison Building, 100 Veterans Memorial Highway

Hauppauge, NY 11788

Rachel Kramer Esq.

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

90 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Harold J. Levy Esq.

Attorney at Law Offices of Harold J. Levy, P.C.

P.O .Box 3613

Fort Pierce, FL 34948

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 05/13/2020, on behalf of Appellant Raymond A. Semente D.C., P.C., alerting court that the motion for reconsideration filed in the district court remains pending, RECEIVED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2838324] [20-1201]--[Edited 05/13/2020 by RD] [Entered: 05/13/2020 10:03 AM]

#14

(#14) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2826132] [20-1201] [Entered: 04/24/2020 05:09 PM]

#13

(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee County of Suffolk, Suffolk County Labor/Management Committee and The Employee Medical Health Plan of Suffolk County, FILED. Service date 04/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2826092] [20-1201] [Entered: 04/24/2020 04:47 PM]

#11

(#11) FRAP 4(a)4 NOTICE, to Appellant Raymond A. Semente D.C., P.C., copy to District Court, SENT.[2818571] [20-1201] [Entered: 04/13/2020 05:04 PM]

12 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

12 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/17/2020, RECEIVED.[2818524] [20-1201] [Entered: 04/13/2020 04:35 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 03/16/2020, RECEIVED.[2818522] [20-1201] [Entered: 04/13/2020 04:34 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 05/13/2020, on behalf of Appellant Raymond A. Semente D.C., P.C., alerting court that the motion for reconsideration filed in the district court remains pending, RECEIVED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2838324] [20-1201]--[Edited 05/13/2020 by RD] [Entered: 05/13/2020 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2826132] [20-1201] [Entered: 04/24/2020 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee County of Suffolk, Suffolk County Labor/Management Committee and The Employee Medical Health Plan of Suffolk County, FILED. Service date 04/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2826092] [20-1201] [Entered: 04/24/2020 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FRAP 4(a)4 NOTICE, to Appellant Raymond A. Semente D.C., P.C., copy to District Court, SENT.[2818571] [20-1201] [Entered: 04/13/2020 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docket(#7) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Harold J. Levy, Esq. for Appellant Raymond A. Semente D.C., P.C., orally informed to renew his admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2818542] [20-1201] [Entered: 04/13/2020 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2819461] [20-1201] [Entered: 04/14/2020 09:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Raymond A. Semente D.C., P.C., district court receipt # ANYEDC-12654024, FILED.[2818528] [20-1201] [Entered: 04/13/2020 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/17/2020, RECEIVED.[2818524] [20-1201] [Entered: 04/13/2020 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 03/16/2020, RECEIVED.[2818522] [20-1201] [Entered: 04/13/2020 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Raymond A. Semente D.C., P.C., FILED. [2818515] [20-1201] [Entered: 04/13/2020 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Verizon New York, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon New England Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc. d/b/a Empire BlueCross BlueShield and/or Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Services Corp is a litigant