This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/17/2021 at 11:31:48 (UTC).

Raven Capital Group v. CH CRP 26

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Raven Capital Group filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CH CRP 26. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-50167

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

CH CRP 26, L.L.C.

Plaintiff / Appellant

Raven Capital Group, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Nicole Leonard Cordoba

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P.

300 W. 6Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Hiba Kazim

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P.

300 W. 6Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Cara Susan Kelly

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P.

300 W. 6Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Josh Kahane

Attorney at Glankler Brown, P.L.L.C.

6000 Poplar Avenue

Memphis, TN 38119

Aubrey B. Greer Esq.

Attorney at Glankler Brown, P.L.L.C.

6000 Poplar Avenue

Memphis, TN 38119

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Raven Capital Group, L.L.C.. Extension Granted to and including 06/16/2021. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 06/16/2021 for Appellant Raven Capital Group, L.L.C. [21-50167] (SB) [Entered: 04/21/2021 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Cara Susan Kelly for party(s) Appellee CH CRP 26, L.L.C., in case 21-50167 [21-50167] (MBC) [Entered: 04/06/2021 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-50167] (Cara Susan Kelly ) [Entered: 04/02/2021 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/11/2021 for Appellant Raven Capital Group, L.L.C.. [21-50167] (MRW) [Entered: 04/01/2021 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-50167] (MRW) [Entered: 04/01/2021 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Aubrey B. Greer for party(s) Appellant Raven Capital Group, L.L.C., in case 21-50167 [21-50167] (RSM) [Entered: 03/19/2021 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Josh Kahane for Appellant Raven Capital Group, L.L.C. in 21-50167 [21-50167] (MBC) [Entered: 03/18/2021 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 5:21-CV-59. Electronic ROA due on 04/01/2021. [21-50167] (MBC) [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Raven Capital Group, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [21-50167] (MBC) [Entered: 03/17/2021 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Raven Capital Group, L.L.C.for the Court to process. Date of service: 03/16/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cordoba, Kazim; Attorney for Appellant: Kahane. [21-50167] (Josh Kahane ) [Entered: 03/16/2021 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-50167] (Aubrey B. Greer ) [Entered: 03/16/2021 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Josh Kahane for Raven Capital Group, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-50167] (Josh Kahane ) [Entered: 03/16/2021 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUPDATED CASE PROCESSING NOTICE sent. [21-50167] (MBC) [Entered: 03/16/2021 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9527370-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 03/31/2021 for Appellant Raven Capital Group, L.L.C. [21-50167] (MBC) [Entered: 03/16/2021 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Letitia Moncivais. [21-50167] (Letitia Moncivais ) [Entered: 03/11/2021 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Raven Capital Group, L.L.C. [21-50167] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/05/2021 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aubrey Brode Greer