This case was last updated from PACER on 08/20/2021 at 06:07:57 (UTC).

Randy Wiggins v. USA, et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 Randy Wiggins filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55649

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

HEALTH NET

SEDGWICK

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES BOARD OF SUPERVISORS

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

INTERCARE

Plaintiff / Appellant

RANDY WIGGINS

Los Angeles, CA 90003

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Megan F. Beaver

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jeck Dizon

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

633 W 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jeffry A. Miller

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Daniel Phillip Barer Esquire

Attorney at Pollak, Vida & Barer

11150 W. Olympic Blvd., Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Anna Birenbaum

Attorney at Pollak, Vida & Barer

11150 W. Olympic Blvd., Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Aaron Robert Kollitz

Attorney at USLA - Office of the U.S. Attorney

300 N Los Angeles Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Randy Wiggins

10511 S. Grand Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90003

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#2

#3

#4

#9

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • Docket(#8) Attorney Jeck Dizon in 21-55649 substituted by Attorney Jeffry A. Miller in 21-55649 [12202358] (QDL) [Entered: 08/16/2021 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jeffry A. Miller (Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP, 550 West C Street, Suite 1700, San Diego, CA 92101) for Appellee Sedgwick. Substitution for Attorney Jeck Dizon for Appellee Sedgwick. Date of service: 08/16/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12202336] [21-55649] (Miller, Jeffry) [Entered: 08/16/2021 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellee Health Net response opposing motion ([ # 4 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 08/12/2021. [12200001] [21-55649] (Beaver, Megan) [Entered: 08/12/2021 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellee Health Net response opposing motion ([ # 3 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 08/12/2021. [12199973] [21-55649] (Beaver, Megan) [Entered: 08/12/2021 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed Appellant Randy Wiggins letter dated 08/11/2021 re: Certificate of Service. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12203684] (KT) [Entered: 08/17/2021 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Appellant Randy Wiggins motion to consolidate. Deficiencies: None. [12193823] (JFF) [Entered: 08/06/2021 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Appellant Randy Wiggins motion to dismiss. Deficiencies: None. [12193819] (JFF) [Entered: 08/06/2021 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed original and 0 copies of Appellant Randy Wiggins opening brief of 10 pages (Informal: Yes). Served on 08/04/2021. Served by Court via CM/ECF. Filed with minor deficiencies: no certificate of service. [12192142] (KWG) [Entered: 08/04/2021 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Randy Wiggins opening brief due 08/16/2021. Appellees County of Los Angeles Board of Supervisors, Health Net, Intercare, Sedgwick and United States of America answering brief due 09/15/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12149241] (JBS) [Entered: 06/21/2021 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Health Net Health Plan of Oregon, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sedgwick is a litigant