This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/05/2021 at 06:11:24 (UTC).

Randall Pavlock v. Eric Holcomb, et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 Randall Pavlock filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Eric Holcomb. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1599

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

RANDALL PAVLOCK

RAYMOND CAHNMAN

KIMBERLEY PAVLOCK

Defendant / Appellees

ERIC J. HOLCOMB

CAMERON CLARK

CURTIS HILL

TOM LAYCOCK

THEODORE E. ROKITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Christopher M. Kieser

Attorney at PACIFIC LEGAL FOUNDATION

930 G Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Kathryn Daly Valois

Attorney at PACIFIC LEGAL FOUNDATION

4440 Pga Boulevard

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Andrea Elizabeth Rahman

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 W. Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

Benjamin M. L. Jones

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 W. Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

Aaron T. Craft

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 W. Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

 

Court Documents

#19

#17

#16

15 #2

Appellants' Separate Appendix

15 #1

Appellants' Opening Brief and Required Appendix

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#3

#2

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Filed Non-Party Reply to Opposition to Motion for Contingent Intervention by Save the Dunes. [7161827] [21-1599] (Hyman, Jeffrey) [Entered: 05/20/2021 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Docket(#18) Paper copies of appellant brief and appendix filed by Appellants Raymond Cahnman, Kimberley Pavlock and Randall Pavlock. [18] [7161645] [21-1599] (PNR) [Entered: 05/20/2021 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Filed Appendix by Appellants Raymond Cahnman, Kimberley Pavlock and Randall Pavlock. [17] [7160788] Paper copies due on 05/24/2021 [21-1599] (GW) [Entered: 05/17/2021 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Appellant's brief filed by Appellants Raymond Cahnman, Kimberley Pavlock and Randall Pavlock. Paper copies due on 05/24/2021. Appellee's brief due on or before 06/16/2021 for Cameron Clark, Eric J. Holcomb, Tom Laycock and Theodore E. Rokita. Electronically Transmitted. [16] [7160787] [21-1599] (GW) [Entered: 05/17/2021 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Submitted appellant brief by Christopher M. Kieser for Appellants Raymond Cahnman, Kimberley Pavlock and Randall Pavlock. [15] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7160727] [21-1599] (Kieser, Christopher) [Entered: 05/17/2021 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Filed Response by Appellees Cameron Clark, Eric J. Holcomb, Tom Laycock and Theodore E. Rokita to Save the Dunes' Motion for Contingent Leave to Intervene. [14][7160550] [21-1599] (Craft, Aaron) [Entered: 05/14/2021 05:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed Response by Appellants Raymond Cahnman, Kimberley Pavlock and Randall Pavlock to Motion for Contingent Leave to Intervene by Save the Dunes. [13][7160444] [21-1599] (Kieser, Christopher) [Entered: 05/14/2021 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER re: Motion to intervene. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file any responses to the motion to intervene on or before May 14, 2021. [12] [7157525] [21-1599] (AP) [Entered: 05/03/2021 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed Non-Party Motion by Save the Dunes, Inc.. [7157029] [21-1599] (Hyman, Jeffrey) [Entered: 04/29/2021 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jeffrey B. Hyman for Save the Dunes, Inc.. [10] [7157026] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1599] (Hyman, Jeffrey) [Entered: 04/29/2021 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Benjamin Jones for Appellees Eric J. Holcomb, Cameron Clark, Tom Laycock and Theodore E. Rokita. [9] [7155527] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1599] [9] [7155527] [21-1599]--[Edited 04/22/2021 by ZNS to reflect the addition of counsel] (Jones, Benjamin) [Entered: 04/22/2021 08:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kathryn D. Valois for Appellants Raymond Cahnman, Kimberley Pavlock and Randall Pavlock. [8] [7154806] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1599] [Edited 04/19/2021 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Valois, Kathryn) [Entered: 04/19/2021 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kathryn D. Valois for Appellants Raymond Cahnman, Kimberley Pavlock and Randall Pavlock. [7] [7154779] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1599] (Valois, Kathryn) [Entered: 04/19/2021 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Raymond Cahnman, Kimberley Pavlock and Randall Pavlock. [6] [7154750] [21-1599] (Kieser, Christopher) [Entered: 04/19/2021 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Christopher M. Kieser for Appellants Raymond Cahnman, Kimberley Pavlock and Randall Pavlock. [5] [7153638] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1599] (Kieser, Christopher) [Entered: 04/13/2021 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#4) Appellee Curtis Hill substituted by Appellee Theodore E. Rokita, pursuant to FRAP 43(c). [4] [7153516] [21-1599] (MM) [Entered: 04/12/2021 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Circuit Rule 43 Notice of Substitution by Appellees Eric J. Holcomb, Curtis Hill, Cameron Clark and Tom Laycock. [3] [7153462] [21-1599] (Craft, Aaron) [Entered: 04/12/2021 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Aaron T. Craft for Appellees Curtis Hill, Eric J. Holcomb, Tom Laycock and Cameron Clark. [2] [7153413] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [21-1599] [2] [7153413] [21-1599]--[Edited 04/12/2021 by ZNS to reflect the termination and addition of counsel] (Craft, Aaron) [Entered: 04/12/2021 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 04/20/2021. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/17/2021 for Raymond Cahnman, Kimberley Pavlock and Randall Pavlock [1] [7152465] [21-1599] (AP) [Entered: 04/07/2021 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin M L Jones

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrea Elizabeth Rahman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron T. Craft