This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/19/2020 at 06:18:22 (UTC).

Randall Callahan, et al v. United Network for Organ

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Randall Callahan filed an Other lawsuit against United Network for Organ. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-13932

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, a body politic and corporate and an independent instrumentality of the State of Kansas

RANDALL CALLAHAN

UNIVERSITY OF IOWA

PIEDMONT HEALTHCARE

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN, on behalf of its academic medical center, Michigan Medicine

INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH

THE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY

BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL

HENRY FORD HEALTH SYSTEM

MICHAEL WINGATE

KATRYNA GRISSON

UNIVERSITY OF KENTUCKY

THE RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, on behalf of its Medical Center

VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY

SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL OF KANSAS CITY

CANDICE SEAMAN

VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER

OREGON HEALTH & SCIENCE UNIVERSITY

EMORY UNIVERSITY, d.b.a. Emory University Hospital

Defendant / Appellant

UNITED NETWORK FOR ORGAN SHARING

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Courtney A. Carrell

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 N Harwood St Ste 600

Dallas, TX 75201

William Roquemore Taylor

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Ave Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Peter Canfield

Attorney at Jones Day

1420 Peachtree St Ne Ste 800

Atlanta, GA 30339

Glenn Lorin Krinsky

Attorney at Jones Day

555 S Flower St Fl 50

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John M. Majoras

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Sean H. Suber

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP

35 W Wacker Dr Fl 39

Chicago, IL 60601

Jay S. Blumenkopf

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani

1 Battery Pk Plz Fl 28

New York, NY 10004

Linda T. Coberly

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP

35 W Wacker Dr Fl 39

Chicago, IL 60601

Thomas G. Weber

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP

35 W Wacker Dr Fl 39

Chicago, IL 60601

Sara Anderson Frey

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

1717 Arch St Ste 610

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Kimberly Council Sheridan

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

55 Ivan Allen Jr Blvd Nw Ste 750

Atlanta, GA 30308

Daniel D. Rubinstein

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP

35 W Wacker Dr Fl 39

Chicago, IL 60601

Melanie Laiyee Lee

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP

35 W Wacker Dr Fl 39

Chicago, IL 60601

Lauren Gailey

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP

1901 L St Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Other Attorneys

KatieLynn Boyd Townsend

Attorney at Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

1156 15Th St Nw Ste 1020

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Proposed Amicus Brief

Open Document #1

Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Order on Motion for Reconsideration doc#298

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kimberly Sheridan for United Network for Organ Sharing [20-13932] (ECF: Jay Blumenkopf) [Entered: 12/18/2020 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sara Anderson Frey for United Network for Organ Sharing. [20-13932] (ECF: Sara Frey) [Entered: 12/18/2020 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jay S. Blumenkopf for United Network for Organ Sharing. [20-13932] (ECF: Jay Blumenkopf) [Entered: 12/18/2020 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant United Network for Organ Sharing [20-13932] (ECF: Linda Coberly) [Entered: 12/01/2020 07:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Katie Townsend for Amicus Curiae Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. [9249723-1] [20-13932] (ECF: KatieLynn Townsend) [Entered: 12/01/2020 05:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Katie Townsend for Amicus Curiae Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press [20-13932] (ECF: KatieLynn Townsend) [Entered: 12/01/2020 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate [20-13932] (ECF: Peter Canfield) [Entered: 12/01/2020 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Courtney A. Carrell for Appellees Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13932] (ECF: Courtney Carrell) [Entered: 11/17/2020 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Courtney A. Carrell for Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. [20-13932] (ECF: Courtney Carrell) [Entered: 11/17/2020 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Peter Canfield for Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. [20-13932] (ECF: Peter Canfield) [Entered: 11/17/2020 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Linda T. Coberly for Appellant United Network for Organ Sharing. [20-13932] (ECF: Linda Coberly) [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Linda T. Coberly for Appellant United Network for Organ Sharing. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13932] (ECF: Linda Coberly) [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Melanie L. Lee for United Network for Organ Sharing [20-13932] (ECF: Melanie Lee) [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lauren Gailey for United Network for Organ Sharing [20-13932] (ECF: Lauren Gailey) [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sean H. Suber for United Network for Organ Sharing. [20-13932] (ECF: Sean Suber) [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas G. Weber for United Network for Organ Sharing. [20-13932] (ECF: Thomas Weber) [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel D. Rubinstein for United Network for Organ Sharing. [20-13932] (ECF: Daniel Rubinstein) [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Linda T. Coberly for United Network for Organ Sharing. [20-13932] (ECF: Linda Coberly) [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 10/20/2020 as to Appellant United Network for Organ Sharing. [Entered: 10/28/2020 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant United Network for Organ Sharing on 10/20/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/30/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/03/2020 as to Appellant United Network for Organ Sharing. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/17/2020 as to Appellee Randall Callahan [Entered: 10/28/2020 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED NETWORK FOR ORGAN SHARING is a litigant

Latest cases where Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF KENTUCKY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Washington University is a litigant