This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:01:56 (UTC).

Ralph Walsh, Jr. v. Lisa Hodge, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Ralph Walsh, Jr filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Lisa Hodge. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-10785

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

JESSICA HARTOS

JOHN SCHETZ

LISA KILLMAN-WORRALL

VICTOR KOSMOPOULOS

LISA HODGE

PATRICIA GWIRTZ

EMILY SPENCE-ALMAGUER

MICHAEL R. WILLIAMS

SUMIHIRO SUZUKI

DAMON SCHRANZ

LISA KILLAM-WORRALL

Plaintiff / Appellee

RALPH CLAY WALSH, JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Rola Daaboul

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Lanora Christine Pettit

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548 (Mc 059)

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Julie Ellen Heath

Attorney at Farrow-Gillespie & Heath, L.L.P.

1700 Pacific Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Patricia Gwirtz, Ms. Jessica Hartos, Ms. Lisa Hodge, Ms. Lisa Killman-Worrall, Mr. Victor Kosmopoulos, Mr. John Schetz, Mr. Damon Schranz, Ms. Emily Spence-Almaguer, Mr. Sumihiro Suzuki and Mr. Michael R. Williams [19-10785] (RAJ) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:51 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Julie Ellen Heath for Mr. Ralph Clay Walsh, Jr. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10785] (Julie Ellen Heath ) [Entered: 07/31/2019 01:54 PM]

Open Document #2

Paper Copies Form

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9101911-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-10785] (SDH) [Entered: 07/19/2019 02:38 PM]

Open Document #2

Brief Paper Copies Form

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Ms. Patricia Gwirtz, Ms. Jessica Hartos, Ms. Lisa Hodge, Ms. Lisa Killam-Worrall, Mr. Victor Kosmopoulos, Mr. John Schetz, Mr. Damon Schranz, Ms. Emily Spence-Almaguer, Mr. Sumihiro Suzuki and Mr. Michael R. Williamsfor the Court to process. Date of service: 07/29/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Daaboul, Pettit; Attorney for Appellee: Heath. [19-10785] (Lanora Christine Pettit ) [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:03 PM]

Open Document

CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9097909-2] NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Patricia Gwirtz, Ms. Jessica Hartos, Ms. Lisa Hodge, Ms. Lisa Killman-Worrall, Mr. Victor Kosmopoulos, Mr. John Schetz, Mr. Damon Schranz, Ms. Emily Spence-Almaguer, Mr. Sumihiro Suzuki and Mr. Michael R. Williams. [9097909-1] [19-10785] (RAJ) [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:00 PM]

Open Document #1

Record Excerpts Filed

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10785] (Lanora Christine Pettit ) [Entered: 07/25/2019 11:17 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/04/2019 for Appellants Patricia Gwirtz, Jessica Hartos, Lisa Hodge, Lisa Killam-Worrall, Victor Kosmopoulos, John Schetz, Damon Schranz, Emily Spence-Almaguer, Sumihiro Suzuki and Michael R. Williams. [19-10785] (CMB) [Entered: 07/26/2019 09:26 AM]

Open Document #1

Appellant/Petitioner Brief Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • Paper copies of Record Excerpts filed by Appellants Mr. Michael R. Williams, Ms. Lisa Hodge, Mr. John Schetz, Ms. Jessica Hartos, Ms. Emily Spence-Almaguer, Mr. Sumihiro Suzuki, Mr. Victor Kosmopoulos, Ms. Patricia Gwirtz, Mr. Damon Schranz and Ms. Lisa Killam-Worrall in 19-10785 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [19-10785] (MAS) [Entered: 09/04/2019 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • Paper copies of Appellant Brief filed by Appellants Mr. Michael R. Williams, Ms. Lisa Hodge, Mr. John Schetz, Ms. Jessica Hartos, Ms. Emily Spence-Almaguer, Mr. Sumihiro Suzuki, Mr. Victor Kosmopoulos, Ms. Patricia Gwirtz, Mr. Damon Schranz and Ms. Lisa Killam-Worrall in 19-10785 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-10785] (MAS) [Entered: 09/04/2019 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 09/03/2019 for Appellants Patricia Gwirtz, Jessica Hartos, Lisa Hodge, Lisa Killam-Worrall, Victor Kosmopoulos, John Schetz, Damon Schranz, Emily Spence-Almaguer, Sumihiro Suzuki and Michael R. Williams. [19-10785] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Ms. Patricia Gwirtz, Ms. Jessica Hartos, Ms. Lisa Hodge, Ms. Lisa Killam-Worrall, Mr. Victor Kosmopoulos, Mr. John Schetz, Mr. Damon Schranz, Ms. Emily Spence-Almaguer, Mr. Sumihiro Suzuki and Mr. Michael R. Williams. Date of service: 08/29/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Daaboul, Pettit; Attorney for Appellee: Heath [19-10785] (Lanora Christine Pettit ) [Entered: 08/29/2019 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 09/30/2019 for Appellee Ralph Clay Walsh Jr.. Paper Copies of Brief due on 09/03/2019 for Appellants Patricia Gwirtz, Jessica Hartos, Lisa Hodge, Lisa Killam-Worrall, Victor Kosmopoulos, John Schetz, Damon Schranz, Emily Spence-Almaguer, Sumihiro Suzuki and Michael R. Williams. [19-10785] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Patricia Gwirtz, Ms. Jessica Hartos, Ms. Lisa Hodge, Ms. Lisa Killam-Worrall, Mr. Victor Kosmopoulos, Mr. John Schetz, Mr. Damon Schranz, Ms. Emily Spence-Almaguer, Mr. Sumihiro Suzuki and Mr. Michael R. Williams. Date of service: 08/29/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Daaboul, Pettit; Attorney for Appellee: Heath [19-10785] (Lanora Christine Pettit ) [Entered: 08/29/2019 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Julie Ellen Heath for Appellee Ralph Clay Walsh Jr. in 19-10785 [19-10785] (CB) [Entered: 08/01/2019 07:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Julie Ellen Heath for Mr. Ralph Clay Walsh, Jr. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10785] (Julie Ellen Heath ) [Entered: 07/31/2019 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary - no hearings [19-10785] (MVM) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Ms. Patricia Gwirtz, Ms. Jessica Hartos, Ms. Lisa Hodge, Ms. Lisa Killam-Worrall, Mr. Victor Kosmopoulos, Mr. John Schetz, Mr. Damon Schranz, Ms. Emily Spence-Almaguer, Mr. Sumihiro Suzuki and Mr. Michael R. Williamsfor the Court to process. Date of service: 07/29/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Daaboul, Pettit; Attorney for Appellee: Heath. [19-10785] (Lanora Christine Pettit ) [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Lanora Christine Pettit for party(s) Appellant Victor Kosmopoulos Appellant Patricia Gwirtz Appellant Lisa Hodge Appellant Jessica Hartos Appellant Sumihiro Suzuki Appellant Damon Schranz Appellant John Schetz Appellant Lisa Killam-Worrall Appellant Emily Spence-Almaguer Appellant Michael R. Williams, in case 19-10785 [19-10785] (MVM) [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/04/2019 for Appellants Patricia Gwirtz, Jessica Hartos, Lisa Hodge, Lisa Killam-Worrall, Victor Kosmopoulos, John Schetz, Damon Schranz, Emily Spence-Almaguer, Sumihiro Suzuki and Michael R. Williams. [19-10785] (CMB) [Entered: 07/26/2019 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-10785] (CMB) [Entered: 07/26/2019 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • CASE CAPTION updated. Appellant Lisa Killman-Worrall in 19-10785 substituted by Appellant Lisa Killam-Worrall in 19-10785 [19-10785] (RAJ) [Entered: 07/25/2019 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10785] (Lanora Christine Pettit ) [Entered: 07/25/2019 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:17-CV-323. Electronic ROA due on 08/05/2019. [19-10785] (SDH) [Entered: 07/19/2019 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9101911-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-10785] (SDH) [Entered: 07/19/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9097909-2] NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Patricia Gwirtz, Ms. Jessica Hartos, Ms. Lisa Hodge, Ms. Lisa Killman-Worrall, Mr. Victor Kosmopoulos, Mr. John Schetz, Mr. Damon Schranz, Ms. Emily Spence-Almaguer, Mr. Sumihiro Suzuki and Mr. Michael R. Williams. [9097909-1] [19-10785] (RAJ) [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Patricia Gwirtz, Ms. Jessica Hartos, Ms. Lisa Hodge, Ms. Lisa Killman-Worrall, Mr. Victor Kosmopoulos, Mr. John Schetz, Mr. Damon Schranz, Ms. Emily Spence-Almaguer, Mr. Sumihiro Suzuki and Mr. Michael R. Williams [19-10785] (RAJ) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.