This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/08/2022 at 13:51:14 (UTC).

Ralph Johnson, et al v. NCAA, et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 Ralph Johnson, filed an Other lawsuit against NCAA,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-8003

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, a/k/a THE NCAA, AND THE FOLLOWINGNCAA DIVISION I MEMBER SCHOOLSAS REPRESENTATIVES OF ADEFENDANT CLASS OF ALL PRIVATEAND SEMI-PUBLIC NCAA DIVISION IMEMBER SCHEDULES

LAFAYETTE COLLEGE

VILLANOVA UNIVERSITY

CORNELL UNIVERSITY

Respondents

RALPH TREY JOHNSON, ndividually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated

CLAUDIA RUIZ, ndividually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated

JACOB WILLEBEEK-LEMAIR, ndividually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated

NICHOLAS LABELLA, ndividually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated

ALEXA COOKE, ndividually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated

STEPHANIE KERKELES, ndividually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated

RHESA FOSTER, ndividually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated

ESTEBAN SUAREZ, ndividually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated

ZACHARY HARRIS, ndividually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated

LAURA HAMILTON, ndividually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated

MATTHEW SCHMIDT, ndividually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated

LIAM WALSH, ndividually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated

GINA SNYDER, ndividually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated

TAMARA SCHOEN, ndividually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated

DREXEL UNIVERSITY

UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorneys

Alexandria M. Gilbert Esq.

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete

2029 Century Park East, Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Steven B. Katz Esq.

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete

2029 Century Park East, Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Sarah Kroll-Rosenbaum Esq.

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete

2029 Century Park East, Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

John E. MacDonald Esq.

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete

Princeton South Corporate Center, Suite 140, 100 Charles Ewing Boulevard

Ewing, NJ 08628

Donald S. Prophete Esq.

Attorney at Contangy Brooks Smith & Prophete

2600 Grand Boulevard, Suite 750

Kansas City, MO 64108

Taylor J. Crabill Esq.

Attorney at Wigdor

85 Fifth Avenue, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10003

Paul L. McDonald Esq.

1800 John F. Kennedy Boulevard

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Renan Varghese Esq.

Attorney at Wigdor

85 Fifth Avenue, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10003

MIchael J. Willemin Esq.

Attorney at Wigdor

85 Fifth Avenue, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10003

Other Attorneys

Marla N. Presley Esq.

Attorney at Jackson Lewis

1001 Liberty Avenue, Suite 1000

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#1

Miscellaneous Original Proceeding Docketed

1 #2

Case Caption

1 #3

Petition for Leave to Appeal

#2

(#2) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Steven B. Katz on behalf of Petitioner(s) National Collegiate Athletic Association, Cornell University, Fordham University, Lafayette College, Sacred Heart University and Villanova University. [22-8003] (SBK) [Entered: 01/11/2022 11:53 AM]

#3

(#3) ORDER (Clerk) The petition seeks permission to appeal the district court's August 25, 2021, order (ECF #56). A copy of the order was not attached to the petition, however. See Fed. R. App. P. 5(b)(1)(E)(i) (requiring copy of order in addition to opinion). Within seven days, the petitioners must file an addendum containing a copy of the order they wish to appeal. This order does not affect the respondents' deadline for answering the petition. (JK) [Entered: 01/11/2022 05:06 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to PETITION on behalf of Petitioners Cornell University, Fordham University, Lafayette College, NCAA, Sacred Heart University, Villanova University and Respondents Drexel University and University of Pennsylvania. Certificate of Service dated 01/12/2022 by ECF. [22-8003] (SBK) [Entered: 01/12/2022 01:14 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: Response filed by Respondents Alexa Cooke, Rhesa Foster, Laura Hamilton, Zachary Harris, Ralph Trey Johnson, Stephanie Kerkeles, Nicholas Labella, Claudia Ruiz, Matthew Schmidt, Tamara Schoen, Gina Snyder, Esteban Suarez, Liam Walsh and Jacob Willebeek-Lemair to original proceeding Petition 1292(b) Permission to Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 01/18/2022. [22-8003] (MJW) [Entered: 01/18/2022 01:56 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael J. Willemin on behalf of Respondent(s) RALPH TREY JOHNSON, CLAUDIA RUIZ, JACOB WILLEBEEK-LEMAIR. NICHOLAS LABELLA, ALEXA COOKE, STEPHANIE KERKELES, RHESA FOSTER, ESTEBAN SUAREZ, ZACHARY HARRIS, LAURA HAMILTON, MATTHEW SCHMIDT, LIAM WALSH, GINA SNYDER and TAMARA SCHOEN. [22-8003] (MJW) [Entered: 01/18/2022 03:05 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Renan F. Varghese on behalf of Respondent(s) RALPH TREY JOHNSON, CLAUDIA RUIZ, JACOB WILLEBEEK-LEMAIR. NICHOLAS LABELLA, ALEXA COOKE, STEPHANIE KERKELES, RHESA FOSTER, ESTEBAN SUAREZ, ZACHARY HARRIS, LAURA HAMILTON, MATTHEW SCHMIDT, LIAM WALSH, GINA SNYDER and TAMARA SCHOEN. [22-8003] (MJW) [Entered: 01/18/2022 03:06 PM]

8 #1

Court Order Filed

8 #2

Notice Permission Appeal Granted

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • Docket(#9) Case has been transferred to general docket at No. 22-1223. (PDB) [Entered: 02/08/2022 02:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER (KRAUSE and RESTREPO, Circuit Judges) The petition for permission to appeal is granted. The Court will consider the issue as certified by the District Court, namely: Whether NCAA Division I student athletes can be employees of the colleges and universities they attend for purposes of the Fair Labor Standards Act solely by virtue of their participation in interscholastic athletics.. Panel No.: ACO-032. Krause, Authoring Judge. (PDB) [Entered: 02/03/2022 02:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Renan F. Varghese on behalf of Respondent(s) RALPH TREY JOHNSON, CLAUDIA RUIZ, JACOB WILLEBEEK-LEMAIR. NICHOLAS LABELLA, ALEXA COOKE, STEPHANIE KERKELES, RHESA FOSTER, ESTEBAN SUAREZ, ZACHARY HARRIS, LAURA HAMILTON, MATTHEW SCHMIDT, LIAM WALSH, GINA SNYDER and TAMARA SCHOEN. [22-8003] (MJW) [Entered: 01/18/2022 03:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael J. Willemin on behalf of Respondent(s) RALPH TREY JOHNSON, CLAUDIA RUIZ, JACOB WILLEBEEK-LEMAIR. NICHOLAS LABELLA, ALEXA COOKE, STEPHANIE KERKELES, RHESA FOSTER, ESTEBAN SUAREZ, ZACHARY HARRIS, LAURA HAMILTON, MATTHEW SCHMIDT, LIAM WALSH, GINA SNYDER and TAMARA SCHOEN. [22-8003] (MJW) [Entered: 01/18/2022 03:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: Response filed by Respondents Alexa Cooke, Rhesa Foster, Laura Hamilton, Zachary Harris, Ralph Trey Johnson, Stephanie Kerkeles, Nicholas Labella, Claudia Ruiz, Matthew Schmidt, Tamara Schoen, Gina Snyder, Esteban Suarez, Liam Walsh and Jacob Willebeek-Lemair to original proceeding Petition 1292(b) Permission to Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 01/18/2022. [22-8003] (MJW) [Entered: 01/18/2022 01:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to PETITION on behalf of Petitioners Cornell University, Fordham University, Lafayette College, NCAA, Sacred Heart University, Villanova University and Respondents Drexel University and University of Pennsylvania. Certificate of Service dated 01/12/2022 by ECF. [22-8003] (SBK) [Entered: 01/12/2022 01:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Clerk) The petition seeks permission to appeal the district court's August 25, 2021, order (ECF #56). A copy of the order was not attached to the petition, however. See Fed. R. App. P. 5(b)(1)(E)(i) (requiring copy of order in addition to opinion). Within seven days, the petitioners must file an addendum containing a copy of the order they wish to appeal. This order does not affect the respondents' deadline for answering the petition. (JK) [Entered: 01/11/2022 05:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Steven B. Katz on behalf of Petitioner(s) National Collegiate Athletic Association, Cornell University, Fordham University, Lafayette College, Sacred Heart University and Villanova University. [22-8003] (SBK) [Entered: 01/11/2022 11:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition for Permission to Appeal under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) filed by Petitioners Cornell University, Fordham University, Lafayette College, Lafayette College, NCAA, Sacred Heart University and Villanova University. Received on 01/10/2022. Certificate of Service dated 01/07/2022. Service made by Email, ECF. (JK) [Entered: 01/10/2022 09:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VILLANOVA UNIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Cornell University is a litigant

Latest cases where University of Pennsylvania is a litigant

Latest cases where DREXEL UNIVERSITY is a litigant