This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/16/2021 at 06:00:24 (UTC).

Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC v. Acadia Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/17/2021 Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Acadia Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1834

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

RAILROAD AVENUE PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendant / Appellee

ACADIA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

James E. Grumbach

Attorney at Boston Law Collaborative LLC

80 William Stste 200

Wellesley, MA 02481-4110

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Robert J. Maselek Jr.

Attorney at McDonough Cohen & Maselek LLP

205B Willow St2Nd Flr

South Hamilton, MA 01982

 

Court Documents

Open Document

DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC. Certificate of service dated 12/09/2021. [21-1834] (LIM) [Entered: 12/10/2021 11:08 AM]

Open Document #2

Appellee's Briefing Notice

Open Document #1

Appellant's Brief

Open Document

APPENDIX filed by Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC. Certificate of service dated 12/09/2021. Five paper copies of the electronically filed appendix must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 12/17/2021. [21-1834] (AVN) [Entered: 12/10/2021 10:36 AM]

Open Document

APPENDIX tendered by Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC. Certificate of service dated 12/09/2021. [21-1834] (JEG) [Entered: 12/09/2021 02:04 PM]

Open Document

BRIEF tendered by Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC. [21-1834] (JEG) [Entered: 12/09/2021 02:01 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Acadia Insurance Company filed by Attorney Robert J. Maselek, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 11/04/2021. [21-1834] (RJM) [Entered: 11/04/2021 02:00 PM]

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2021. [21-1834] (JEG) [Entered: 11/03/2021 11:22 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 11/02/2021. [21-1834] CLERK'S NOTE: The document is incomplete. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, BY 11/05/2021. (JEG) [Entered: 11/02/2021 09:56 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 11/16/2021, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Robert J. Maselek, Jr. for Acadia Insurance Company. [21-1834] (GB) [Entered: 11/02/2021 06:46 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file a transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Transcript report/order form due 11/16/2021 . [21-1834] (GB) [Entered: 11/02/2021 06:39 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC filed by Attorney James E. Grumbach. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2021. [21-1834] (JEG) [Entered: 10/27/2021 10:00 AM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC. Certificate of service dated 10/26/2021. [21-1834] (JEG) [Entered: 10/27/2021 09:57 AM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC. Certificate of service dated 12/09/2021. [21-1834] (LIM) [Entered: 12/10/2021 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC. Certificate of service dated 12/09/2021. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 12/17/2021 . Brief due 01/10/2022 for APPELLEE Acadia Insurance Company. [21-1834] (LIM) [Entered: 12/10/2021 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX filed by Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC. Certificate of service dated 12/09/2021. Five paper copies of the electronically filed appendix must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 12/17/2021. [21-1834] (AVN) [Entered: 12/10/2021 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX tendered by Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC. Certificate of service dated 12/09/2021. [21-1834] (JEG) [Entered: 12/09/2021 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF tendered by Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC. [21-1834] (JEG) [Entered: 12/09/2021 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Acadia Insurance Company filed by Attorney Robert J. Maselek, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 11/04/2021. [21-1834] (RJM) [Entered: 11/04/2021 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 12/13/2021 for appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [21-1834] (GB) [Entered: 11/03/2021 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2021. [21-1834] (JEG) [Entered: 11/03/2021 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 11/02/2021. [21-1834] CLERK'S NOTE: The document is incomplete. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, BY 11/05/2021. (JEG) [Entered: 11/02/2021 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 11/16/2021, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Robert J. Maselek, Jr. for Acadia Insurance Company. [21-1834] (GB) [Entered: 11/02/2021 06:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file a transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Transcript report/order form due 11/16/2021 . [21-1834] (GB) [Entered: 11/02/2021 06:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of filing the following transcript in district court by Court Reporter Marianne Kusa-Ryll: 01/12/2021, Telephonic Summary Judgment Motion Hearing. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [21-1834] (GB) [Entered: 11/03/2021 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC filed by Attorney James E. Grumbach. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2021. [21-1834] (JEG) [Entered: 10/27/2021 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC. Certificate of service dated 10/26/2021. [21-1834] (JEG) [Entered: 10/27/2021 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #35) filed by Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 11/01/2021 . [21-1834] (GB) [Entered: 10/17/2021 08:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #35) filed by Appellant Railroad Avenue Properties, LLC. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 11/01/2021 . [21-1834] (GB) [Entered: 10/17/2021 08:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACADIA INSURANCE CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert J. Maselek, Jr.