This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/19/2022 at 06:02:25 (UTC).

Rahman v. Mendoza Jaddou

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Rahman filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Mendoza Jaddou. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-101

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Kazi Ashikur Rahman

Defendant / Appellees

Ur Mendoza Jaddou

District Director Thomas Cioppa

Merrick B. Garland, United States Attorney General

Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Naresh M. Gehi Esq.

Attorney at Law Offices of N.M. Gehi, P.C.

74-09 37Th Avenue

Jackson Heights, NY 11372

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Varuni Nelson

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of New York

271 Cadman Plaza East

Brooklyn, NY 11201

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time, [ # 26 ], filed by Appellant Kazi Ashikur Rahman. Appellant has until April 14, 2022 to file his principal brief. Appellees brief is due 35 days after Appellants brief is filed, by JON, FILED. [3274073][30] [22-101] [Entered: 03/08/2022 03:57 PM]

#26

RESTRICTED

#24

RESTRICTED

#23

RESTRICTED

#22

RESTRICTED

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

RESTRICTED

#18

(#18) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM C [ # 8 ], on behalf of Appellant Kazi Ashikur Rahman, FILED.[3249575] [22-101] [Entered: 01/25/2022 02:26 PM]

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time, [ # 26 ], filed by Appellant Kazi Ashikur Rahman. Appellant has until April 14, 2022 to file his principal brief. Appellees brief is due 35 days after Appellants brief is filed, by JON, FILED. [3274073][30] [22-101] [Entered: 03/08/2022 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Kazi Ashikur Rahman, FILED. Service date 03/04/2022 by CM/ECF. [3272410] [22-101] [Entered: 03/04/2022 06:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: FORM C, [ # 18 ], [ # 22 ], [ # 24 ], on behalf of Appellant Kazi Ashikur Rahman, FILED.[3260252] [22-101] [Entered: 02/14/2022 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Kazi Ashikur Rahman, FILED. Service date 02/11/2022 by CM/ECF.[3260196] [22-101] [Entered: 02/11/2022 08:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 03/17/2022, appellee's brief due date as 04/21/2022,TRANSMITTED.[3259124] [22-101] [Entered: 02/10/2022 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [21], on behalf of Appellant Kazi Ashikur Rahman, FILED.[3259110] [22-101] [Entered: 02/10/2022 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • Docket(#21) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Kazi Ashikur Rahman, FILED. Service date 02/08/2022 by CM/ECF.[3257759] [22-101] [Entered: 02/08/2022 07:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CAPTION, added Director to Defendant-Appellee Ur Mendoza Jaddou, AMENDED.[3249704] [22-101] [Entered: 01/25/2022 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NEW CASE MANAGER, Veronica Balladares, ASSIGNED.[3249695] [22-101] [Entered: 01/25/2022 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM C [ # 8 ], on behalf of Appellant Kazi Ashikur Rahman, FILED.[3249575] [22-101] [Entered: 01/25/2022 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Thomas Cioppa and Merrick B. Garland, FILED. Service date 01/20/2022 by CM/ECF.[3246769] [22-101] [Entered: 01/20/2022 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Kazi Ashikur Rahman, FILED. Service date 01/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3246322] [22-101] [Entered: 01/19/2022 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Kazi Ashikur Rahman, FILED. Service date 01/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3246318] [22-101] [Entered: 01/19/2022 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Kazi Ashikur Rahman, FILED. Service date 01/19/2022 by CM/ECF.[3246317] [22-101] [Entered: 01/19/2022 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3245328] [22-101] [Entered: 01/19/2022 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Kazi Ashikur Rahman, district court receipt # ANYEDC-15198086, FILED.[3245327] [22-101] [Entered: 01/19/2022 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/05/2022, RECEIVED.[3245326] [22-101] [Entered: 01/19/2022 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Kazi Ashikur Rahman, FILED. [3245318] [22-101] [Entered: 01/19/2022 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where District Director Thomas Cioppa is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Varuni Nelson