This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/08/2020 at 06:14:07 (UTC).

Rahkspaul Dogra v. Robert Griffin, III

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 Rahkspaul Dogra filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Robert Griffin, III. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3120

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

Robert C. Griffin, III

Plaintiff / Appellant

Rahkspaul Ben Dogra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kevin A. Fritz

Attorney at MEISTER & SEELIG

7Th Floor, 125 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Kyle P. Seelbach

Attorney at HUSCH & BLACKWELL

Suite 600, 190 Carondelet Plaza

Saint Louis, MO 63105-3441

Josef S. Glynias

Attorney at HUSCH & BLACKWELL

Suite 600, 190 Carondelet Plaza

Saint Louis, MO 63105-3441

Mitchell Schuster

Attorney at MEISTER & SEELIG

7Th Floor, 125 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

John D. Comerford

Attorney at DOWD & BENNETT

Suite 1900, 7733 Forsyth Boulevard

Saint Louis, MO 63105-0000

James B. Martin

Attorney at DOWD & BENNETT

Suite 1900, 7733 Forsyth Boulevard

Saint Louis, MO 63105-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED. [4968754] [20-3120] (HAG) [Entered: 10/23/2020 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - Granting [ # 4968600-2 ] motion to dismiss case filed by Mr. John D. Comerford. The case is dismissed in accordance with Rule 42(b), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Mandate shall issue forthwith. [4968749] [20-3120] (HAG) [Entered: 10/23/2020 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to dismiss case, filed by Attorney Mr. John D. Comerford for Appellant Mr. Rahkspaul Ben Dogra w/service 10/22/2020. [4968600] [20-3120] (JDC) [Entered: 10/22/2020 05:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Josef S. Glynias for Appellee Robert C. Griffin, III w/service 10/16/2020 [4966268] [20-3120] (JSG) [Entered: 10/16/2020 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by James B. Martin for Appellant Mr. Rahkspaul Ben Dogra w/service 10/14/2020 [4965410] [20-3120] (JBM) [Entered: 10/14/2020 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by John D. Comerford for Appellant Mr. Rahkspaul Ben Dogra w/service 10/14/2020 [4965407] [20-3120] (JDC) [Entered: 10/14/2020 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 11/18/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Rahkspaul Ben Dogra due 11/18/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4964565] [20-3120] (AEV) [Entered: 10/09/2020 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Memorandum and Order 9/9/20, Judgment 9/9/20, docket entries, [4964697] [20-3120] (AEV) [Entered: 10/13/2020 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4964562] [20-3120] (AEV) [Entered: 10/09/2020 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D. Comerford

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Blaine Martin