This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/08/2021 at 06:07:45 (UTC).

Raffi Kajberouni v. Bear Valley CSD, et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 Raffi Kajberouni filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Bear Valley CSD. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15033

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT

BEAR VALLEY SPRINGS POLICE DEPARTMENT

Plaintiff / Appellant

RAFFI H. KAJBEROUNI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Donald M. Davis Esquire

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP

444 South Flower Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michelle L. Reynolds

Attorney at THE LEGAL ADVOCATE

110 Cognac Circle

Sacramento, CA 95835

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Raffi H. Kajberouni. Date of service: 03/05/2021. [12026785] [21-15033] (Reynolds, Michelle) [Entered: 03/05/2021 11:56 PM]

#7

(#7) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Raffi H. Kajberouni. Date of service: 03/05/2021. [12026779] [21-15033] (Reynolds, Michelle) [Entered: 03/05/2021 10:08 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12009289] (VS) [Entered: 02/19/2021 09:07 AM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 02/18/2021, 1:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11992311] (VS) [Entered: 02/04/2021 08:53 AM]

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Raffi H. Kajberouni Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/26/2021. [11982484] [21-15033] (Reynolds, Michelle) [Entered: 01/26/2021 04:58 PM]

#2

(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11974809] (LW) [Entered: 01/21/2021 11:39 AM]

1 #5

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Raffi H. Kajberouni. Date of service: 03/05/2021. [12026785] [21-15033] (Reynolds, Michelle) [Entered: 03/05/2021 11:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Raffi H. Kajberouni. Date of service: 03/05/2021. [12026779] [21-15033] (Reynolds, Michelle) [Entered: 03/05/2021 10:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12009289] (VS) [Entered: 02/19/2021 09:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 02/18/2021, 1:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11992311] (VS) [Entered: 02/04/2021 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/26/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11982574]. [21-15033] (AD) [Entered: 01/26/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Raffi H. Kajberouni Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/26/2021. [11982484] [21-15033] (Reynolds, Michelle) [Entered: 01/26/2021 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11974809] (LW) [Entered: 01/21/2021 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Raffi H. Kajberouni Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/14/2021. Appellant Raffi H. Kajberouni opening brief due 03/05/2021. Appellees Bear Valley Community Services District and Bear Valley Springs Police Department answering brief due 04/05/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11955421] (JBS) [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY SERVICE DISTRICT is a litigant