This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/07/2020 at 06:16:19 (UTC).

Raffel Systems, LLC v. Man Wah Holdings Limited

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 Raffel Systems, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Man Wah Holdings Limited. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2126

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

RAFFEL SYSTEMS, LLC

Appellee

MAN WAH HOLDINGS LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

John C. Scheller

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich, LLP

One South Pinckney Street, Suite 700, Po Box 1806

Madison, WI 53703

Appellee Attorney

Shen Wang

Attorney at Arch & Lake LLP

203 N Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 08/04/2020. [712700] Entry of Appearance is due on 08/19/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/19/2020. Docketing Statement is due on 08/19/2020. Certified List is due on 09/14/2020. [EKD] [Entered: 08/05/2020 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Raffel Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shen Wang