This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 05:08:52 (UTC).

Rafael Pimentel-Estrada v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Rafael Pimentel-Estrada filed an Other lawsuit against William Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-70384

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RAFAEL PIMENTEL-ESTRADA

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hakeem Ishola Esquire

Attorney at Ishola Law Group, LLC

1750 West Research Way, Suite 204

West Valley City, UT 84119

Respondent Attorneys

Shahrzad Baghai

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

OIL

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Petition for Review

1 #4

IJ Order

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Shahrzad Baghai for party(s) Respondent William P. Barr, in case 20-70384. [11596286] (NAC) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Shahrzad Baghai (Department of Justice) for Respondent William P. Barr. Date of service: 02/13/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11596278] [20-70384] (Baghai, Shahrzad) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#5) Resources Available As you get ready to prepare your opening brief, please consult the Immigration Outline ( # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/guides/immigration_outline.php ) prepared by court staff and also consider contacting the court's mentoring program (see Appellate Mentoring Program at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/attorneys/ ) for help with the brief and argument. (Notice sent to counsel for petitioner.) [11595715]. [20-70384] (CD) [Entered: 02/12/2020 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to stay removal filed ( RE: [ # 3 ] Motion (ECF Filing) , [ # 3 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to stay removal/deportation (ECF)). Deficiency: None. Pursuant to G.O. 6.4(c) A TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL IS IN EFFECT pending further order. Response to motion for stay due 04/08/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. The existing briefing schedule shall continue in effect. [11595641] (HH) [Entered: 02/12/2020 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Petitioner Rafael Pimentel-Estrada Motion to stay removal. Date of service: 02/12/2020. [11595623] [20-70384] (Ishola, Hakeem) [Entered: 02/12/2020 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Hakeem Ishola (Ishola Law Group, LLC, 1750 W. Research Way #204, West Valley City, Utah 84119) for Petitioner Rafael Pimentel-Estrada. Substitution for Attorney Mr. Hakeem Ishola, Esquire for Petitioner Rafael Pimentel-Estrada. Date of service: 02/12/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11595616] [20-70384] (Ishola, Hakeem) [Entered: 02/12/2020 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED BIA Petition for Review. COUNSELED. Petitioner detained? YES. Certified Administrative Record due 03/18/2020. Petitioner opening brief due 05/18/2020 for Rafael Pimentel-Estrada. Respondent brief due 07/16/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. [11595570] (JBS) [Entered: 02/12/2020 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.