This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2020 at 06:02:35 (UTC).

Rafael Olivo, et al v. Director Newark New Jersey Fie, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 Rafael Olivo filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Director Newark New Jersey Fie. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2449

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

RAFAEL LIRIANO OLIVO

JAVIER SANTIAGO MARTINEZ

ADRIAN ENRIQUE GONZALEZ GARZA

MICHAEL ACOSTA GRANADOS

VICTOR MEDINA LOPEZ

Defendant / Appellants

WARDEN ESSEX COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY

DIRECTOR NEWARK NEW JERSEY FIELD OFFICE IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

ATTORNEY GENERAL UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

DIRECTOR UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Brittany Castle Esq.

Attorney at Immigrant Defense Project

28 West 39Th Street, Suite 501

New York, NY 10018

Matthew Johnson Esq.

Attorney at American Friends Service Committee

570 Broad Street, Suite 1001

Newark, NJ 07102

Lauren Major Esq.

Attorney at American Friends Service Committee

570 Broad Street, Suite 1001

Newark, NJ 07102

Leila Kang Esq.

Attorney at Immigrant Defense Project

28 West 39Th Street, Suite 501

New York, NY 10018

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

John T. Stinson Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

402 East State Street

Trenton, NJ 08608

Enes Hajdarpasic Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

Kruti Dharia Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

J. Andrew Ruymann Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

Victor M. Mercado-Santana Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Stations

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Leila Kang on behalf of Appellee(s) Rafael Liriano Olivo, Adrian Enrique Gonzalez Garza, Victor Medina Lopez, Michael Acosta Granados, Javier Santiago Martinez. [20-2449] (LK) [Entered: 09/10/2020 12:12 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellants Attorney General United States of America, Director Newark New Jersey Field Office Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security and Warden Essex County Correctional Facility for Extension of Time to File Brief and Appendix. Certificate of Service dated 09/04/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-2449]--[Edited 09/04/2020 by TMM] (VMM) [Entered: 09/04/2020 03:08 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lauren Major on behalf of Appellee(s) Rafael LIRIANO OLIVO; Victor MEDINA LOPEZ; Adrian Enrique GONZALEZ GARZA; Michaell ACOSTA GRANADOS; Javier SANTIAGO MARTINEZ. [20-2449] (LM) [Entered: 09/01/2020 01:45 PM]

6 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

6 #1

Briefing Notice Issued

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Attorney General United States of America, Director Newark New Jersey Field Office Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security and Warden Essex County Correctional Facility. [20-2449] (VMM) [Entered: 07/24/2020 06:03 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew A. Johnson on behalf of Appellee(s) Rafael LIRIANO OLIVO; Victor MEDINA LOPEZ; Adrrian Enrique GONZALEZ GARZA; Michaell ACOSTA GRANADOS; Javier SANTIAGO MARTINEZ. [20-2449] (MJ) [Entered: 07/23/2020 03:45 PM]

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Victor M. Mercado-Santana on behalf of Appellant(s) Director Newark NJ Field Office ICE; Warden, Essex Cnty. Correctional Facility; Director ICE; Secretary of DHS; Att'y Gen. of the U.S.. [20-2449] (VMM) [Entered: 07/17/2020 11:01 AM]

1 #5

Civil Counsel Habeas Letter

1 #4

Standing Order

1 #3

caption

1 #2

DC Order 5/15/20

#1

Civil Case Docketed

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Leila Kang on behalf of Appellee(s) Rafael Liriano Olivo, Adrian Enrique Gonzalez Garza, Victor Medina Lopez, Michael Acosta Granados, Javier Santiago Martinez. [20-2449] (LK) [Entered: 09/10/2020 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) granting motion for extension of time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Warden Essex County Correctional Facility, Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security, Attorney General United States of America, Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Director Newark New Jersey Field Office Immigration & Customs Enforcement. Appellants' brief and appendix must be filed and served on or before November 9, 2020. (MB) [Entered: 09/10/2020 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellants Attorney General United States of America, Director Newark New Jersey Field Office Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security and Warden Essex County Correctional Facility for Extension of Time to File Brief and Appendix. Certificate of Service dated 09/04/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-2449]--[Edited 09/04/2020 by TMM] (VMM) [Entered: 09/04/2020 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lauren Major on behalf of Appellee(s) Rafael LIRIANO OLIVO; Victor MEDINA LOPEZ; Adrian Enrique GONZALEZ GARZA; Michaell ACOSTA GRANADOS; Javier SANTIAGO MARTINEZ. [20-2449] (LM) [Entered: 09/01/2020 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Attorney General United States of America, Director Newark New Jersey Field Office Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security and Warden Essex County Correctional Facility due on or before 09/08/2020. Appendix due on or before 09/08/2020. (TMM) [Entered: 07/27/2020 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Attorney General United States of America, Director Newark New Jersey Field Office Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security and Warden Essex County Correctional Facility. [20-2449] (VMM) [Entered: 07/24/2020 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew A. Johnson on behalf of Appellee(s) Rafael LIRIANO OLIVO; Victor MEDINA LOPEZ; Adrrian Enrique GONZALEZ GARZA; Michaell ACOSTA GRANADOS; Javier SANTIAGO MARTINEZ. [20-2449] (MJ) [Entered: 07/23/2020 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Victor M. Mercado-Santana on behalf of Appellant(s) Director Newark NJ Field Office ICE; Warden, Essex Cnty. Correctional Facility; Director ICE; Secretary of DHS; Att'y Gen. of the U.S.. [20-2449] (VMM) [Entered: 07/17/2020 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Attorney General United States of America, Director Newark New Jersey Field Office Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security and Warden Essex County Correctional Facility in District Court No. 2-20-cv-03481. (TMM) [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARDEN ESSEX COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY is a litigant

Latest cases where DIRECTOR NEWARK NEW JERSEY FIELD OFFICE IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY is a litigant