This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:03:33 (UTC).

Raelene Galusha, et al v. Unigard Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Raelene Galusha filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Unigard Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16396

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

RAELENE GALUSHA

GREG GALUSHA

Defendant / Appellee

UNIGARD INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Timothy John O'Connor Esquire

Attorney at The O'Connor Law Firm

9245 Laguna Springs Drive

Elk Grove, CA 95758

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Rebecca R. Weinreich Esquire

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Max Gerald Garcia Esquire

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #6

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [11373695] (LW) [Entered: 07/23/2019 01:29 PM]

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

#8

(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellants Greg Galusha and Raelene Galusha Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/24/2019. [11375892] [19-16396] (O'Connor, Timothy) [Entered: 07/24/2019 07:05 PM]

#12

(#12) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellants only, 09/05/2019, 4:00 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellants Greg Galusha and Raelene Galusha opening brief due 10/15/2019. Appellee Unigard Insurance Company answering brief due 11/14/2019. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11414287] (CL) [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:46 PM]

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #3

Mediaiton Questionnaire Instructions

#5

(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellee Unigard Insurance Company Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/22/2019. [11372145] [19-16396] (Garcia, Max) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:17 PM]

#10

(#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/23/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11384676] (CL) [Entered: 08/01/2019 03:45 PM]

#11

(#11) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/28/2019, 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 08/23/2019 ). [11394656] (CL) [Entered: 08/12/2019 02:57 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellants only, 09/05/2019, 4:00 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellants Greg Galusha and Raelene Galusha opening brief due 10/15/2019. Appellee Unigard Insurance Company answering brief due 11/14/2019. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11414287] (CL) [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/28/2019, 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 08/23/2019 ). [11394656] (CL) [Entered: 08/12/2019 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/23/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11384676] (CL) [Entered: 08/01/2019 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • (#9) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/24/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11375932][19-16396] (AD) [Entered: 07/25/2019 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) Appellants Greg Galusha and Raelene Galusha Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/24/2019. [11375892] [19-16396] (O'Connor, Timothy) [Entered: 07/24/2019 07:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [11373695] (LW) [Entered: 07/23/2019 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#6) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11372555][19-16396] (AD) [Entered: 07/22/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) Appellee Unigard Insurance Company Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/22/2019. [11372145] [19-16396] (Garcia, Max) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#4) Added Attorney(s) Max Gerald Garcia for party(s) Appellee Unigard Insurance Company, in case 19-16396. [11371740] (NAC) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Max Gerald Garcia (Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP, 633 W. 5th Street, Suite 4000, Los Angeles, CA 90071) for Appellee Unigard Insurance Company. Date of service: 07/22/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11371732] [19-16396] (Garcia, Max) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Timothy John O'Connor (The O'Connor Law Firm 9245 Laguna Springs Drive, Suite 200, Elk Grove, CA 95758) for Appellants Greg Galusha and Raelene Galusha. Substitution for Attorney Timothy John O'Connor, Esquire for Appellants Greg Galusha and Raelene Galusha. Date of service: 07/16/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11364932] [19-16396] (O'Connor, Timothy) [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/22/2019. Appellants Greg Galusha and Raelene Galusha opening brief due 09/13/2019. Appellee Unigard Insurance Company answering brief due 10/15/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11363977] (RT) [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less