Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2020 at 06:01:05 (UTC).

Radoncic v. E&A Worldwide Traders Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 Radoncic filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against E A Worldwide Traders Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2000

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Haris Radoncic

Appellees and 3Rd Party Defendants

Millennium Products Group, LLC.

Steven Goldmeier

Closeout Binge, Inc.

Counter Claimants

E&A Worldwide Traders Inc.

Elan Eliav, Elan Eliav

Elan Eliav, jointly and severally

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee and Plaintiff Attorneys

Anastasi Pardalis Esq.

Attorney at Pardalis & Nohavicka, LLP

3510 Broadway

Astoria, NY 11106

Eleni Melekou Esq.

Attorney at Pardalis & Nohavicka, LLP

950 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Counter Claimant Attorney

Wayne J. Schaefer Esq.

Attorney at Schaefer Law Group, P.C.

186 West Main Street

Smithtown, NY 11747

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Steven Goldmeier and Millennium Products Group, LLC., FILED. Service date 07/21/2020 by CM/ECF.[2889267] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/21/2020 03:55 PM]

#27

(#27) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [25], on behalf of Appellee Steven Goldmeier and Millennium Products Group, LLC., FILED.[2889012] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/21/2020 01:12 PM]

#24

(#24) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Millennium Products Group, LLC. and Steven Goldmeier, FILED. Service date 07/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2888829] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/21/2020 11:14 AM]

#23

(#23) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant E&A Worldwide Traders Inc. and Elan Eliav, informing Court of proposed due date 10/02/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 07/21/2020 by CM/ECF.[2888766] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/21/2020 10:36 AM]

#22

(#22) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 08/12/2020, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2883218] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:21 PM]

#18

(#18) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant E&A Worldwide Traders Inc. and Elan Eliav, FILED. Service date 07/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2882013] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/10/2020 03:21 PM]

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#12

(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant E&A Worldwide Traders Inc. and Elan Eliav, FILED. Service date 07/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2878656] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/07/2020 06:27 PM]

#11

(#11) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, Corrected, Corrected, [8], [9], [10], on behalf of Appellant E&A Worldwide Traders Inc. and Elan Eliav, FILED.[2878493] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/07/2020 04:32 PM]

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant E&A Worldwide Traders Inc. and Elan Eliav, district court receipt # ANYEDC-12972863, FILED.[2871316] [20-2000] [Entered: 06/25/2020 04:59 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/27/2020, RECEIVED.[2871315] [20-2000] [Entered: 06/25/2020 04:58 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CURED DEFECTIVE, Notice of Appearance as Subsitute Counsel [ # 28 ], on behalf of Appellee Steven Goldmeier and Millennium Products Group, LLC., FILED.[2889400] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/21/2020 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Steven Goldmeier and Millennium Products Group, LLC., FILED. Service date 07/21/2020 by CM/ECF.[2889267] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/21/2020 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [25], on behalf of Appellee Steven Goldmeier and Millennium Products Group, LLC., FILED.[2889012] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/21/2020 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ATTORNEY, Eleni Melekou for Steven Goldmeier Millennium Products Group, LLC., in case 20-2000 , [ # 24 ], ADDED.[2888997] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/21/2020 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Steven Goldmeier and Millennium Products Group, LLC., FILED. Service date 07/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2888892] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/21/2020 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Millennium Products Group, LLC. and Steven Goldmeier, FILED. Service date 07/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2888829] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/21/2020 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant E&A Worldwide Traders Inc. and Elan Eliav, informing Court of proposed due date 10/02/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 07/21/2020 by CM/ECF.[2888766] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/21/2020 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 08/12/2020, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2883218] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CURED DEFECTIVE, Form C, [ # 18 ], on behalf of Appellant E&A Worldwide Traders Inc. and Elan Eliav, FILED.[2882067] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/10/2020 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant E&A Worldwide Traders Inc. and Elan Eliav, FILED. Service date 07/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2882013] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/10/2020 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant E&A Worldwide Traders Inc. and Elan Eliav, FILED. Service date 07/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2878656] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/07/2020 06:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, Corrected, Corrected, [8], [9], [10], on behalf of Appellant E&A Worldwide Traders Inc. and Elan Eliav, FILED.[2878493] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/07/2020 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docket(#10) CORRECTED , on behalf of Appellant E&A Worldwide Traders Inc. and Elan Eliav, FILED. Service date 07/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2878368] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/07/2020 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docket(#9) CORRECTED , on behalf of Appellant E&A Worldwide Traders Inc. and Elan Eliav, FILED. Service date 07/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2878361] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/07/2020 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant E&A Worldwide Traders Inc. and Elan Eliav, FILED. Service date 07/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2878353] [20-2000] [Entered: 07/07/2020 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY, Anastasi Pardalis , [ # 1 ], in place of attorney Ariadne Anna Panagopoulou Alexandrou , SUBSTITUTED.[2871785] [20-2000] [Entered: 06/26/2020 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2871318] [20-2000] [Entered: 06/25/2020 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant E&A Worldwide Traders Inc. and Elan Eliav, district court receipt # ANYEDC-12972863, FILED.[2871316] [20-2000] [Entered: 06/25/2020 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/27/2020, RECEIVED.[2871315] [20-2000] [Entered: 06/25/2020 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant E&A Worldwide Traders Inc. and Elan Eliav, FILED. [2871308] [20-2000] [Entered: 06/25/2020 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILLENNIUM PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anastasi Pardalis