This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:02:40 (UTC).

Rachelle Davis v. American Airlines, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Rachelle Davis filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against American Airlines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1739

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MICHELLE MAGEE

MARK MOSCICKI

TERRY DIX

AMERICAN AIRLINES, INCORPORATED

Plaintiff / Appellant

RACHELLE DAVIS

Charlotte, NC 28217

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel E. Farrington

Attorney at FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP

7501 Wisconsin Avenue

Bethesda, MD 20814-0000

Crystal-Gaye Melissa Trotter

Attorney at FISHER & PHILLIPS, LLP

P. O. Box 36775

Charlotte, NC 28236-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Rachelle Davis

6600 Antrim Court

Charlotte, NC 28217

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by American Airlines, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000549241] [19-1739] Daniel Farrington [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:51 PM]

#2

(#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Informal Opening Brief due 08/09/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-1739] RHS [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:16 AM]

#11

(#11) INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by Rachelle Davis. [19-1739] RHS [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:56 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel E. Farrington for American Airlines, Incorporated. [1000549232] [19-1739] Daniel Farrington [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:47 PM]

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Rachelle Davis. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000558153] [19-1739] RHS [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:49 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00044-MOC-DSC. Case manager: RSewell. [19-1739] RHS [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:15 AM]

#6

(#6) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Rachelle Davis. [19-1739] RHS [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:50 PM]

#8

(#8) MOTION by Rachelle Davis for leave to file electronically. Date and method of service: 07/31/2019 US mail. [1000564307] [19-1739] RHS [Entered: 08/09/2019 02:30 PM]

#10

(#10) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by American Airlines, Incorporated, Terry Dix, Michelle Magee and Mark Moscicki. [19-1739] Daniel Farrington [Entered: 08/15/2019 04:24 PM]

#9

(#9) ORDER filed [1000564320] granting appellant's motion to receive electronic notification. [ # 8 ] Copies to all parties.. [19-1739] SAC [Entered: 08/09/2019 02:35 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by Rachelle Davis. [19-1739] RHS [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by American Airlines, Incorporated, Terry Dix, Michelle Magee and Mark Moscicki. [19-1739] Daniel Farrington [Entered: 08/15/2019 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER filed [1000564320] granting appellant's motion to receive electronic notification. [ # 8 ] Copies to all parties.. [19-1739] SAC [Entered: 08/09/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION by Rachelle Davis for leave to file electronically. Date and method of service: 07/31/2019 US mail. [1000564307] [19-1739] RHS [Entered: 08/09/2019 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • (#7) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00044-MOC-DSC. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1739] RHS [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Rachelle Davis. [19-1739] RHS [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Rachelle Davis. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000558153] [19-1739] RHS [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by American Airlines, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000549241] [19-1739] Daniel Farrington [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel E. Farrington for American Airlines, Incorporated. [1000549232] [19-1739] Daniel Farrington [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Informal Opening Brief due 08/09/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-1739] RHS [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00044-MOC-DSC. Case manager: RSewell. [19-1739] RHS [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.